Reports for OMA CAPITAL AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout OMA CAPITAL AG
- OMA CAPITAL AG has its legal headquarters in Frauenfeld, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- OMA CAPITAL AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 07.03.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the company OMA CAPITAL AG is registered under the UID CHE-114.735.605.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: GLATZ AG, WUPA Holding AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.02.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Frauenfeld
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.021.931-3
UID/VAT
CHE-114.735.605
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten von Beteiligungen an anderen Gesellschaften und deren Finanzierung. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, sich mit anderen Unternehmungen zusammenschliessen und Liegenschaften kaufen oder verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
steffen rausch kessler ag weinfelden | Weinfelden | 07.03.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revit Treuhand AG | Zürich | 26.02.2009 | 06.03.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: OMA CAPITAL AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005694887, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
OMA CAPITAL AG, in Frauenfeld, CHE-114.735.605, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 13.03.2015, S.0, Publ. 2041135). [Teils-Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Revit Treuhand AG, in Zürich (CH-020.3.004.844-1), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ma, Zhun-An, taiwanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Taipei (TW), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Glatz, Markus, von Basel, in Frauenfeld, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gubser, Andreas, von Zürich, in Frauenfeld, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
steffen rausch kessler ag weinfelden (CHE-101.810.516), in Weinfelden, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2041135, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
OMA CAPITAL AG, in Frauenfeld, CHE-114.735.605, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 08.09.2009, S. 14, Publ. 5236524).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ma, Zhun-An, taiwanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Taipei (TW), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Ma, Joen-An].
Publication number: 5236524, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
OMA CAPITAL AG, in Frauenfeld, CH-440.3.021.931-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 26.02.2009, S. 18, Publ. 4900866).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ma, Joen-An, chinesischer Staatsangehöriger, in Taipei (TW), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Glatz, Markus, von Basel, in Frauenfeld, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.