Reports for Oetterli Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Oetterli Immobilien AG
- Oetterli Immobilien AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Aetingen. Oetterli Immobilien AG belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Oetterli Immobilien AG consists of one person.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 23.09.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register SO under the UID CHE-479.128.375.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.01.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Buchegg
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.017.506-4
UID/VAT
CHE-479.128.375
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung, Vermietung, Überbauung und Verkauf von Grundstücken. Kann sich an andern Unternehmungen mit gleichem oder ähnlichem Zweck im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche Unternehmungen übernehmen sowie alle Geschäfte durchführen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Oetterli Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006135573, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Oetterli Immobilien AG, in Buchegg, CHE-479.128.375, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 31.01.2019, Publ. 1004555429).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Oetterli, Hubert Gregor, von Solothurn, in Buchegg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR01-1004555429, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Oetterli Immobilien AG, in Buchegg, CHE-479.128.375, Kobirain 14, 4587 Aetingen, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
24.01.2019.
Zweck:
Erwerb, Verwaltung, Vermietung, Überbauung und Verkauf von Grundstücken. Kann sich an andern Unternehmungen mit gleichem oder ähnlichem Zweck im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche Unternehmungen übernehmen sowie alle Geschäfte durchführen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 120'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 120'000.00.
Aktien:
120 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung gemäss zwei Verträgen vom 24.01.2019 das Grundstück Grundbuch Solothurn Nr. 1795 mit der darauf lastenden Grundpfandschuld und einen Personenwagen, wofür 120 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben und CHF 843'200.00 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief oder durch E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Mit Erklärung vom 24.01.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Oetterli, Hubert Gregor, von Solothurn, in Buchegg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Oetterli, Anita, von Solothurn, in Buchegg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.