Reports for NYDEGGER Personal/Engineering AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout NYDEGGER Personal/Engineering AG
- NYDEGGER Personal/Engineering AG from Rietheim operates in the sector «Temp agency services» and is active.
- The management has 6 active persons registered.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 23.05.2024.
- In the commercial register the company NYDEGGER Personal/Engineering AG is registered under the UID CHE-235.478.159.
- Next to the company NYDEGGER Personal/Engineering AG there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Elektra Genossenschaft Rietheim, NYDEGGER Dienstleistungen AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Sandro Nydegger,
Rudolf Nydegger,
Barbara Nydegger,
Sina Nydegger
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Reto Alfred Neukom,
Sandro Nydegger,
Rudolf Nydegger,
Barbara Nydegger,
Sina Nydegger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.07.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zurzach
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.446.113-6
UID/VAT
CHE-235.478.159
Sector
Temp agency services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Personalvermittlung, Personalverleih, Personal- und Organisationsberatung sowie Produktionsplanung und Ausführung von Montagearbeiten für alle Unternehmen; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
René Brunner Treuhand AG | Zürich | 24.08.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wimobag GmbH | Ehrendingen | 04.07.2019 | 23.08.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: NYDEGGER Personal/Engineering AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006038224, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
NYDEGGER Personal/Engineering AG, in Zurzach, CHE-235.478.159, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 24.08.2022, Publ. 1005546786).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Neukom, Reto Alfred, von Rafz, in Ehrendingen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005546786, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
NYDEGGER Personal/Engineering AG, in Zurzach, CHE-235.478.159, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2022, Publ. 1005404965).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wimobag GmbH (CHE-101.713.209), in Ehrendingen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
René Brunner Treuhand AG (CHE-107.390.027), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005404965, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
NYDEGGER Personal/Engineering AG, in Rietheim, CHE-235.478.159, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 23.07.2019, Publ. 1004682244).
Sitz neu:
Zurzach. [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2022].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nydegger, Rudolf, von Rüschegg, in Zurzach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Rietheim];
Nydegger, Sandro, von Rüschegg, in Zurzach, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Rietheim];
Nydegger, Barbara, von Rüschegg, in Zurzach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Rietheim];
Nydegger, Sina, von Rüschegg, in Zurzach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Rietheim].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.