Reports for AIA Gruppe AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout AIA Gruppe AG
- AIA Gruppe AG has its legal headquarters in Neuhaus SG and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The company was founded on 19.03.2007 and has 7 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 02.07.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company AIA Gruppe AG is registered under the UID CHE-113.513.338.
- There are 4 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Akriba Immobilien - Anlagestiftung, Assurinvest AG, Maria baut AG.
Management (7)
newest board members
Michael Niklaus Schmidt,
Nathalie Glaus Cherella,
Andreas Werner Wolfisberg,
Daniel Alexander Hermann Werdenberg
newest authorized signatories
Michael Niklaus Schmidt,
Simon Spiess,
Silvia Rita Lacher,
Nathalie Glaus Cherella,
Dietmar Michael Zacher
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.03.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Eschenbach (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.035.108-0
UID/VAT
CHE-113.513.338
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Halten, der Erwerb und die Veräusserung von in- und ausländischen Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen insbesondre im Vorsorgebereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | St. Gallen | 04.12.2015 | 19.02.2023 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 24.11.2014 | 03.12.2015 | |
audax ag | Zurzach | 09.01.2012 | 25.03.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Nova Vorsorge AG
- Phoenix Vorsorge AG
- Phoenix Vorsorge GmbH
- Emotions car's GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: AIA Gruppe AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006073090, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
AIA Gruppe AG, in Eschenbach (SG), CHE-113.513.338, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 03.04.2023, Publ. 1005715602).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidt, Michael Niklaus, von Zürich, in Hinwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Werdenberg, Daniel, von Basel, in Kirchberg SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005715602, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
AIA Gruppe AG, in Eschenbach (SG), CHE-113.513.338, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2023, Publ. 1005682585).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spiess, Simon, von Tuggen, in Müllheim Dorf (Müllheim), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lacher, Silvia Rita, von Tuggen, in Tuggen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005682585, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
AIA Gruppe AG, in Eschenbach (SG), CHE-113.513.338, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 09.07.2021, Publ. 1005245389). Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 26.01.2023 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
OBT AG (CHE-109.029.855), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.