Address
c/o Christian Huggenberg
Adlerstrasse 14
8400 Winterthur
Reports for Norzang-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Norzang-Stiftung
- Norzang-Stiftung has its legal headquarters in Winterthur, is active and operates in the sector «Other social services».
- The management consists of 7 persons. The organization was founded on 24.01.2013.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 29.06.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-390.331.435.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Anna Ladina Huggenberg,
Hans-Kaspar Huggenberg,
Christian Walter Huggenberg,
Tenzin Choewang Dorjee,
Tsering Dorjee
newest authorized signatories
Anna Ladina Huggenberg,
Hans-Kaspar Huggenberg,
Christian Walter Huggenberg,
Tenzin Choewang Dorjee,
Tsering Dorjee
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.01.2013
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.001.864-7
UID/VAT
CHE-390.331.435
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung unterstützt bedürftige Tibeter in Tibet und ausserhalb Tibets; dies kann auch über andere Organisationen erfolgen. Dazu sollen jährlich 2% des Nettovermögens der Stiftung ausgeschüttet werden. Die Stiftung verfolgt keinen Erwerbszweck und strebt keinen Gewinn an. Sie ist politisch und konfessionell neutral.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Winco Treuhand AG | Winterthur | 18.12.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Coordinator Control AG | Winterthur | 29.01.2013 | 17.12.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Norzang-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005781103, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Norzang-Stiftung, in Winterthur, CHE-390.331.435, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 18.12.2019, Publ. 1004786155).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huggenberg, Anna Ladina, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004786155, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Norzang-Stiftung, in Winterthur, CHE-390.331.435, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 31.05.2018, Publ. 4260245).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Coordinator Control AG (CHE-102.081.518), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huggenberg, Christian Walter, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Huggenberg, Hans Kaspar, von Winterthur, in Horgen, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Winco Treuhand AG (CHE-354.886.915), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4260245, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Norzang-Stiftung, in Winterthur, CHE-390.331.435, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 01.02.2018, Publ. 4028413).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dorjee, Tenzin Choewang, von Winterthur, in Bauma, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.