Reports for NIEDERBERGER + Co. AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout NIEDERBERGER + Co. AG
- NIEDERBERGER + Co. AG has its legal headquarters in Kriens, is active and operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- NIEDERBERGER + Co. AG was founded on 29.06.1953.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 24.02.2016.
- The company is registered in the commercial register LU under the UID CHE-101.569.786.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.06.1953
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.008.659-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.569.786
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Maschinen und Elektrowerkzeugen sowie Uebernahme von Generalvertretungen über Produkte der Schleif- und Poliertechnik; Handel mit Waren aller Art; An- und Verkauf von Liegenschaften; Beteiligungen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG | Kriens | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Niederberger + Co. AG
- Niederberger + Co AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: NIEDERBERGER + Co. AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2685447, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
NIEDERBERGER + Co. AG, in Kriens, CHE-101.569.786, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 27.05.2011, Publ. 6181240).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Urs, von Zug, in Baar, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zehnder, Daniel, von Rothenthurm, in Ingenbohl, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG ( CHE-105.808.783), in Kriens, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG ( CH-100.3.004.593-1)].
Publication number: 6181240, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
NIEDERBERGER + Co. AG, in Kriens, CH-100.3.008.659-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 53 vom 16.03.2005, S. 8, Publ. 2748980).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Niederberger, Erwin, von Dallenwil, in Luzern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG (CH-100.3.004.593-1), in Kriens, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG, in Luzern].
Publication number: 2748980, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
NIEDERBERGER + Co. AG, in Kriens, CH-100.3.008.659-7, Handel mit Maschinen und Elektrowerkzeugen sowie Uebernahme von Generalvertretungen über Produkte der Schleif- und Poliertechnik, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2002, S. 6, Publ. 593718).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederberger, Daniel, von Dallenwil, in Hergiswil NW, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.