Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
Chemin du Pavillon 2
1218 Le Grand-Saconnex
Reports for N&H Switzerland Holding Sàrl
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.12.2000
Deletion from the commercial register
01.07.2022
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Le Grand-Saconnex
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.024.334-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.408.640
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'achat, la vente, l'importation et l'exportation de tous produits, machines, articles et substances en relation avec le secteur de l'alimentation et des soins personnels, tels que notamment les ingrédients et enzymes utilisés dans les produits de nutrition et de soins personnels, et principalement ceux fabriqués ou produits par la société mère ultime de la société ou par toutes autres sociétés affiliées à celle-ci; la vente de tels produits et services principalement à des clients domiciliés à l'étranger; l'achat, l'utilisation, la vente ou l'échange de brevets, procédés de fabrication et marques de fabrique, la concession ou l'utilisation de licences y relatives; la participation, sous quelque forme que ce soit à des entreprises commerciales, financières ou industrielles, en relation directe ou indirecte avec les buts ci-dessus; l'administration de telles participations; l'exploitation de laboratoires destinés tant à la recherche pure qu'à la recherche appliquée dans tous les secteurs de son activité (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Genève | 16.02.2018 | 30.06.2022 | |
KPMG AG | Zug | <2004 | 15.02.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- N&H Switzerland Holding GmbH
- N&H Switzerland Holding LLC
- FMC Chemical International LLC
- FMC Chemical International GmbH
- FMC Chemical International Sàrl
- FMC Chemical International Inc
- FMC Chemical International Ltd
- FMC Chemical International AG
- FMC Chemical International SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: N&H Switzerland Holding Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005510722, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
N&H Switzerland Holding Sàrl, à Le Grand-Saconnex, CHE-101.408.640 (FOSC du 17.02.2022, p. 0/1005408643). Les actifs et les passifs envers les tiers sont repris par SOLAE EUROPE Sàrl, à Le Grand-Saconnex (CHE-101.505.929). La société est radiée par suite de fusion.
Publication number: HR02-1005408643, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
N&H Switzerland Holding Sàrl, à Le Grand-Saconnex, CHE-101.408.640 (FOSC du 18.01.2021, p. 0/1005076903). Laurent Etienne Jean-Emmanuel n'est plus gérant;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Van Laer Jorg Maria R., de Belgique, à Divonne-les-Bains, FRA, est gérant avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005076903, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
N&H Switzerland Holding Sàrl, à Le Grand-Saconnex, CHE-101.408.640 (FOSC du 29.06.2020, p. 0/1004923429). Les gérants Newton Christopher, nommé président et Bond Kirill, jusqu'ici président, continuent à signer individuellement. Dikkers Arnold Marc, des Pays-Bas, à Bassins et Laurent Etienne Jean-Emmanuel, de France, à Genève, sont nommés gérants, avec signature individuelle.