Reports for NALRA Services SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout NALRA Services SA
- NALRA Services SA is currently active and the industry «Fund management». The legal headquarters are in Sion.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 25.09.2014.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 30.03.2021.
- NALRA Services SA is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-281.575.498.
- ALPARK SA, AMELA Management Sàrl, Centaurium Aviation MRO AG, Zweigniederlassung Sion are registered at the same address.
Management (3)
newest board members
Jean-Claude Mourad,
Justine Markovitz Bordenave,
Christophe François Favre
newest authorized signatories
Jean-Claude Mourad,
Justine Markovitz Bordenave,
Christophe François Favre
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.09.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.015.901-4
UID/VAT
CHE-281.575.498
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La fourniture de services d'un Family Office (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: NALRA Services SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005137821, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
NALRA Services SA, à Sion, CHE-281.575.498, société anonyme (No. FOSC 207 du 23.10.2020, Publ. 1005007340).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Mourad, Jean Claude, de Sainte-Croix, à Genève, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle];
Favre, Christophe, de Sierre, à Icogne, administrateur, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, secrétaire, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: HR02-1005007340, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
NALRA Services SA, à Sion, CHE-281.575.498, société anonyme (No. FOSC 96 du 19.05.2020, Publ. 1004893150).
Modification des statuts:
30.09.2020.
Nouvelles actions:
100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.00 liées selon statuts [précédemment: 100 actions au porteur de CHF 1'000.00].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Sunier, François, de Vernier, à Collonge-Bellerive, président, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Mourad, Jean Claude, de Sainte-Croix, à Genève, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: vice-président, avec signature individuelle];
Markovitz Bordenave, Justine, ressortissante britannique, à Genève, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004893150, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
NALRA Services SA, à Sion, CHE-281.575.498, société anonyme (No. FOSC 228 du 25.11.2014, p.0, Publ. 1841567).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Mas, Stéphane, ressortissant français, à Sciez (FR), avec procuration collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.