Reports for myWork AG Niederbipp
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout myWork AG Niederbipp
- myWork AG Niederbipp has its legal headquarters in Niederbipp and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Temp agency services».
- The management of the company myWork AG Niederbipp, which was founded on the 29.06.2016, consists of 2 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 28.05.2021.
- myWork AG Niederbipp is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-347.646.441.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.06.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Niederbipp
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.067.542-0
UID/VAT
CHE-347.646.441
Sector
Temp agency services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Suche, Selektion, Beratung und Schulung von Personal, Zurverfügungstellung von Personal für Fest-, Temporär- und Teilzeitstellen, Lohnverwaltung sowie alle Arbeiten, die mit Outsourcing-Verträgen in Verbindung stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Weber Gähwiler Revisions AG | Zürich | 25.11.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Reinhard Reutimann, Revisionsdienstleistungen | Niederhasli | 04.07.2016 | 24.11.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- myWork AG Biel
- Job Deal Bienne SA
- Job Deal Biel AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: myWork AG Niederbipp
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005195439, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
myWork AG Niederbipp, in Niederbipp, CHE-347.646.441, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 11.09.2020, Publ. 1004976742).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Monaco, Mario, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bäriswil BE (Bäriswil), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Chokchampa, Tenzin, von Horgen, in Horgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004976742, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
myWork AG Biel, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-347.646.441, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 228 vom 25.11.2019, Publ. 1004766875).
Statutenänderung:
31.08.2020.
Firma neu:
myWork AG Niederbipp.
Sitz neu:
Niederbipp.
Domizil neu:
Wydenstrasse 17, 4704 Niederbipp.
Aktien neu:
1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 [bisher: 1'000 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 100.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Moos, Daniel, von Zürich, in Tagelswangen (Lindau), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Monaco, Mario, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bäriswil BE (Bäriswil), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Chokchampa, Tenzin, von Horgen, in Horgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.