Reports for mycultour ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout mycultour ag
- mycultour ag is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Luzern. mycultour ag belongs to the industry «Car dealership» and is currently active.
- The management of the company mycultour ag consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 03.01.2018.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 04.05.2021, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company mycultour ag is registered under the UID CHE-246.832.029.
- Next to the company mycultour ag there are 8 other active companies with an identical address. These include: ALVAG Group AG, Büssli-Shop GmbH, Digital Lifestyle GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.01.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.805.068-7
UID/VAT
CHE-246.832.029
Sector
Car dealership
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Produktion, den Ausbau, den Handel, die Vermietung und die Vermarktung von innovativen Fortbewegungsmitteln aller Art zum Zwecke des Personen- und Sachtransports und die Durchführung von Veranstaltungen. Die Gesellschaft ist ferner befugt, sich in jeder Form an anderen Unternehmungen im ln- und Ausland zu beteiligen, Patente, Lizenzen, Wertschriften und Grundstücke im In- und Ausland zu erwerben, zu verwalten und zu veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann sämtliche Geschäfte tätigen, welche direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck zusammenhangen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: mycultour ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005168028, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
mycultour ag, in Luzern, CHE-246.832.029, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 30.12.2019, Publ. 1004794933).
Statutenänderung:
19.04.2021.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Produktion, den Ausbau, den Handel, die Vermietung und die Vermarktung von innovativen Fortbewegungsmitteln aller Art zum Zwecke des Personen- und Sachtransports und die Durchführung von Veranstaltungen. Die Gesellschaft ist ferner befugt, sich in jeder Form an anderen Unternehmungen im ln- und Ausland zu beteiligen, Patente, Lizenzen, Wertschriften und Grundstücke im In- und Ausland zu erwerben, zu verwalten und zu veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann sämtliche Geschäfte tätigen, welche direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck zusammenhangen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind.
Aktien neu:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004794933, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
mycultour ag, in Luzern, CHE-246.832.029, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 08.01.2018, Publ. 3971605).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Becker, Carsten, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Gersau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steiner, Othmar, von Dagmersellen, in Sins, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3971605, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
mycultour ag, in Luzern, CHE-246.832.029, Lidostrasse 5, 6006 Luzern, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
24.11.2017.
Zweck:
Produktion, Ausbau, Handel und Vermarktung von innovativen Fortbewegungsmitteln aller Art zum Zwecke des Personen- und Sachtransports;
Beteiligungen;
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Patenten, Lizenzen, Wertschriften und Grundstücken.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen im SHAB oder, sofern die Adressen aller Aktionäre bekannt sind, durch eingeschriebenen Brief, A-Post, Telefax oder E-Mail. Mit Erklärung vom 24.11.2017 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Becker, Carsten, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Gersau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Creutzig, Peter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Stockach (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.