Reports for Mount Holding SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Mount Holding SA
- Mount Holding SA is currently active and the industry «Operation of investment companies». The legal headquarters are in Delémont.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 22.06.2020.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 15.11.2023.
- The company Mount Holding SA is registered under the UID CHE-150.285.851.
- The address is identical with 19 other active companies. These include: Asquare Finance International Sàrl, Cabinet Fueg SA, CIPR SWISS Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.06.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Delémont
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.573.758-9
UID/VAT
CHE-150.285.851
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
En Suisse et à l'étranger, l'acquisition, la détention, la gestion, l'administration et la réalisation de participations dans tous types d'entreprises, à l'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la LFAIE. La société pourra effectuer soit pour son propre compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales industrielles, mobilières et immobilières (à l'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la LFAIE), en Suisse et à l'étranger, se rattachant directement ou indirectement au but principal. Elle peut également créer des succursales et des filiales, en Suisse et à l'étranger.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Mount Holding SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005885952, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Mount Holding SA, à Delémont, CHE-150.285.851, société anonyme (No. FOSC 143 du 26.07.2022, Publ. 1005529697).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Spörri, Jonathan Francisco, de Thônex, à Chêne-Bougeries, administrateur, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Coletti, Giordano Vito, de Basel, à Blonay (Blonay - Saint-Légier), administrateur, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005529697, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Mount Holding SA, précédemment à Fribourg, CHE-150.285.851, société anonyme (du 25.06.2020, Publ. 1004920080).
Modification des statuts:
20.07.2022.
Nouveau siège:
Delémont.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue des Moulins 13, 2800 Delémont.
Nouvelles communications:
Communications aux actionnaires: par courrier recommandé ou par courriel.
Nouvelle restriction à la transmissibilité:
Restriction à la transmissibilité des actions nominatives: selon statuts.
Publication number: HR02-1005529205, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Mount Holding SA, à Fribourg, CHE-150.285.851 (FOSC du 25.06.2020, p. 0/1004920080). Cette entité juridique est radiée du registre du commerce du canton de Fribourg par suite du transfert du siège à Delémont.