Reports for Motos Rondeau SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Motos Rondeau SA
- Motos Rondeau SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Vernier. Motos Rondeau SA belongs to the industry «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 16.09.1991.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 03.02.2023.
- Motos Rondeau SA is registered in the Canton of GE under the UID CHE-100.664.241.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.09.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Vernier
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.885.991-8
UID/VAT
CHE-100.664.241
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce, échange et location de motos et scooters neufs, d'occasion, de collection et de compétition et en général opérations s'y rapportant; exploitation d'un atelier mécanique pour la réparation et l'entretien de motos et scooters, et d'un magasin pour la vente d'accessoires, pièces de rechange, équipement spéciaux et habits pour motos et motocyclistes.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Cosolutions Sàrl | Genève | 31.03.2011 | 12.07.2021 | |
Duchosal Berney SA | Genève | <2004 | 23.11.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Motos Rondeau SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005670067, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Motos Rondeau SA, à Carouge (GE), CHE-100.664.241 (FOSC du 13.07.2021, p. 0/1005248285).
Nouveau siège:
Vernier, Chemin Delay 50, 1214 Vernier. Statuts modifiés le 24.01.2023.
Publication number: HR02-1005248285, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Motos Rondeau SA, à Carouge (GE), CHE-100.664.241 (FOSC du 12.04.2021, p. 0/1005147163). Le 01.05.2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives;
par décision de l'assemblée générale du 29.06.2021 les statuts de la société ont été adaptés à la conversion. Les actions nominatives sont liées selon statuts.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 100'000, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives, liées selon statuts. La clause statutaire relative à la reprise de biens envisagée est supprimée conformément à l'art. 628, al. 4 CO.
Communication aux actionnaires:
pli recommandé ou courriel. Nouveaux statuts du 29.06.2021. Selon déclaration du 29.06.2021, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint. Cosolutions Sàrl n'est plus organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005147163, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Motos Rondeau SA, à Carouge (GE), CHE-100.664.241 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225832). Hofer William n'est plus administrateur;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés.
Administration:
Hofer Xavier, jusqu'ici président, lequel signe désormais collectivement à deux, Perrin Marc, de France, à Evires, FRA, président et Goncalves Fabrice, de Birrhard, à Versoix, secrétaire, tous deux avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.