Address
La Charrière 2
1695 Villarsel-le-Gibloux
Reports for Molasse de Villarlod.ch SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Molasse de Villarlod.ch SA
- Molasse de Villarlod.ch SA from Villarsel-le-Gibloux operates in the sector «Mining of stones and earth» and is active.
- The company was founded on 17.01.1986 and has one person in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 17.04.2018.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-103.528.864.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.01.1986
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Gibloux
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.135.198-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.528.864
Sector
Mining of stones and earth
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'exploitation de la carrière de molasse de Villarlod, vente, transport, extraction et commercialisation de blocs de molasse sous toutes formes (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduflex SA | Estavayer | 08.09.2008 | 23.06.2009 | |
Fiduconseils SA | Estavayer | 20.07.2004 | 04.05.2008 | |
BDO SA | Villars-sur-Glâne | <2004 | 19.07.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Carrière de Villarlod SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Molasse de Villarlod.ch SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4175491, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Molasse de Villarlod.ch SA, à Gibloux, CHE-103.528.864 (FOSC du 15.01.2016, p. 0/2600023).
Nouvelle adresse:
La Charrière 2, 1695 Villarsel-le-Gibloux.
Personne radiée:
Rossier Claude, administrateur, secrétaire, signature collective à deux.
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Rossier Jacques, administrateur président, signature collective à deux, nom correct Rossier Jacques Henri, maintenant de Montagny FR, à Gibloux, désormais administrateur président, secrétaire, signature individuelle.
Publication number: 2600023, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Molasse de Villarlod.ch SA, à Le Glèbe, CHE-103.528.864 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826). Inscription d'office par suite de la fusion des communes de Corpataux-Magnedens, Farvagny, Le Glèbe, Rossens FR et Vuisternens-en-Ogoz, selon Loi du 20.05.2015.
nouvelle dénomination du siège:
Gibloux.
Publication number: 5087876, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Carrière de Villarlod SA., à Le Glèbe, CH-217-0135198-1, l'exploitation de la carrière de molasse de Villarlod, etc. (FOSC du 08.09.2008, p. 8).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Molasse de Villarlod.ch SA.
Nouveau but:
l'exploitation de la carrière de molasse de Villarlod, vente, transport, extraction et commercialisation de blocs de molasse sous toutes formes (cf. statuts pour but complet). Division des 50 actions de CHF 2'000.--, nominatives, en 100 actions de CHF 1'000.--, nominatives. Restriction de transmissibilité des actions selon statuts. Statuts modifiés le 28.05.2009.
Capital-actions actuel:
CHF 100'000.--, entièrement libéré, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000.--, nominatives. Repond Jean-Claude n'est plus administrateur unique, sa signature est radiée. Rossier Jacques, de Montagny (FR) et Mannens-Grandsivaz, à Villarsel-le-Gibloux, est nommé président, et Rossier Claude, de Neyruz (FR), à Avry, est nommé secrétaire, tous deux avec signature collective à deux. Selon déclaration du 25.05.2009, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint. Fiduflex SA (CH-217-3539246-1) n'est plus réviseur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.