Address
c/o Rhenum Treuhand AG
Trogenerstrasse 13
9450 Altstätten SG
Reports for MIPA Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout MIPA Holding AG
- MIPA Holding AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of other financial institutions». The legal headquarters are in Altstätten SG.
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 25.01.2021.
- In the commercial register the company MIPA Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-318.621.255.
- There are 9 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: AXA Generalagentur Michael Zeller, D&S Rhenum Holding AG, Fernheizung Breite AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Rudolf Bartholet-Dietrich,
Klaus Fritzsche,
Markus Bernhard Fritzsche
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.06.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Altstätten
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.071.562-6
UID/VAT
CHE-318.621.255
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Den Erwerb sowie das Halten und Verwalten von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland ohne Liegenschaften in der Schweiz. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: MIPA Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005082321, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
MIPA Holding AG, in Altstätten, CHE-318.621.255, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 161 vom 22.08.2016, S.0, Publ. 3013851).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hamm, Ralf Hermann Werner, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Felben-Wellhausen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bartholet, Rudolf, von Altstätten, in Hinterforst (Altstätten), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3013851, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
MIPA Holding AG, in Altstätten, CHE-318.621.255, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 01.12.2015, Publ. 2512055).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bartholet, Rudolf, von Flums und Altstätten, in Hinterforst (Altstätten), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hamm, Ralf Hermann Werner, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Felben-Wellhausen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2512055, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
MIPA Holding AG, in Altstätten, CHE-318.621.255, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 11.06.2012, Publ. 6712358).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fritzsche, Klaus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Landshut (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.