Reports for Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers in Liquidation
- Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers in Liquidation has its legal headquarters in Zizers, is in liquidation and operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers in Liquidation was founded on 08.07.1952.
- On the 28.05.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers in Liquidation is registered in the Canton of GR under the UID CHE-101.727.973.
Management (4)
newest members of the administration
newest authorized signatories
Liquidator
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.07.1952
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Zizers
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.5.000.296-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.727.973
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verbesserung der wirtschaftlichen Verhältnisse ihrer Mitglieder durch Selbsthilfe, insbesondere durch preisgünstige, fristgerechte und kontinuierliche Vermittlung eines bedarfsgerechten Sortiments qualitativ hochwertiger Artikel des land- und hauswirtschaftlichen Bedarfs, zielgerechte Beschaffung und Vermarktung landwirtschaftlicher Erzeugnisse, insbesondere von Milch, Durchführung von Kursen und Vorträgen, Mitgliedschaft bei fenaco, Bern; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: LS03-0000002293, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Genossenschaft Publikationsdatum: SHAB 28.05.2024 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 28.05.2029 Meldungsnummer: Publizierende Stelle Kanzlei Kornplatz AG Advokatur Notariat Steuerberatung, Kornplatz 2, 7001 Chur Liquidationsschuldenruf Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers in Liquidation Organisation in Auflösung: Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers in Liquidation CHE-101.727.973 Hauptstrasse
Kontaktstelle: Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers Hauptstrasse
Publication number: HR02-1006037042, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers, in Zizers, CHE-101.727.973, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 10.06.2013, S.0, Publ. 7221342).
Statutenänderung:
08.05.2024.
Firma neu:
Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers in Liquidation. Die Genossenschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 08.05.2024 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schumacher, Salomon, von Igis, in Zizers, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bannwart, Josef, von Kirchberg (SG), in Zizers, Präsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bernhard, Andreas, von Pfungen, in Zizers, Vizepräsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Item, Christian, von Zizers, in Zizers, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, Aktuar, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Durschei, Edgar, von Disentis/Mustér, in Disentis/Mustér, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 7221342, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Milch- und landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Zizers, in Zizers, CH-350.5.000.296-6, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 27.04.2009, S. 11, Publ. 4990312).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Inauen, Alfred, von Appenzell, in Zizers, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bernhard, Andreas, von Pfungen, in Zizers, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.