Reports for MG Capital AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout MG Capital AG
- MG Capital AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Kilchberg ZH. MG Capital AG belongs to the industry «Fund management» and is currently active.
- MG Capital AG has 2 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 16.03.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company MG Capital AG is registered under the UID CHE-330.045.500.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.06.2021
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kilchberg (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.050.238-5
UID/VAT
CHE-330.045.500
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Vermögensverwaltung, Vergabe von Finanzierungen, Darlehen, etc. an andere Gesellschaften oder Privatpersonen, im eigenen Namen und auf eigene Rechnung. Es werden keine bewilligungspflichtigen Tätigkeiten (gem. Art. 17 FINIG) ausgeübt. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- MG Capital Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: MG Capital AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005427983, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MG Capital AG, in Kilchberg (ZH), CHE-330.045.500, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 156 vom 13.08.2021, Publ. 1005270273).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gut, Hans Christian Emanuel, von Otelfingen, in Kilchberg (ZH), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005270273, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MG Capital AG, in Kilchberg (ZH), CHE-330.045.500, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 08.06.2021, Publ. 1005209690).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Matheis, Fabian, von Kilchberg (ZH), in Kilchberg (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weibel, Jürgen M., von Kloten, in Laax, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR01-1005209690, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MG Capital AG (MG Capital Ltd), in Kilchberg (ZH), CHE-330.045.500, Paradiesstrasse 35, 8802 Kilchberg ZH, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
30.04.2021. 26.05.2021.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Vermögensverwaltung, Vergabe von Finanzierungen, Darlehen, etc. an andere Gesellschaften oder Privatpersonen, im eigenen Namen und auf eigene Rechnung. Es werden keine bewilligungspflichtigen Tätigkeiten (gem. Art. 17 FINIG) ausgeübt. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 30.04.2021 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Matheis, Fabian, von Kilchberg (ZH), in Kilchberg (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.