Address
c/o Zodiac Sàrl
Rue Arbre-de-la-Liberté 3
1920 Martigny
Reports for Mentor/J Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Mentor/J Sàrl
- Mentor/J Sàrl is active in the industry «IT services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Martigny.
- The management of the company Mentor/J Sàrl consists of one person.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 30.01.2013.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Mentor/J Sàrl is the following: CHE-114.139.550.
- Next to the company Mentor/J Sàrl there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: SZ Stéphane Délez Consulting, ZODIAC Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.03.2008
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Martigny
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.4.007.562-5
UID/VAT
CHE-114.139.550
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, vente, développement de tous produits en relation avec l'informatique tels que le développement de logiciels, l'information dans le domaine de l'informatique, l'importation et l'exportation de ces produits ainsi que toutes affaires mobilières, financières et immobilières convergentes.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Mentor/J Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 7041332, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Mentor/J Sàrl, à Martigny, CH-621.4.007.562-5, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 50 du 12.03.2010, p. 24, Publ. 5539608).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Molière, Jérôme, citoyen français, à Saint-Just (F), associé-gérant et président, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Dubuis, Florian, de Sierre et Savièse, à Martigny-Croix (Martigny-Combe), associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: à Martigny, gérant avec signature individuelle, sans part sociale].
Publication number: 5539608, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Mentor/J Sàrl, à Martigny, CH-621.4.007.562-5, société à responsabilité limitée (FOSC no 60 du 28.03.2008, p. 18, publ. 4403838).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Zodiac Sàrl, Rue de l'Arbre de la Liberté 3, 1920 Martigny.
Publication number: 4403838, Commercial Registry Office Valais
Mentor/J Sàrl, à Martigny, CH-621.4.007.562-5, c/o Zodiac Sàrl, Rue du Collège 1, 1920 Martigny, nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Date des statuts:
20.02.2008.
But:
achat, vente, développement de tous produits en relation avec l'informatique tels que le développement de logiciels, l'information dans le domaine de l'informatique, l'importation et l'exportation de ces produits ainsi que toutes affaires mobilières, financières et immobilières convergentes (cf statuts).
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.--.
Faits qualifiés:
Apports en nature: selon contrat du 15.02.2008, sont apportés à la société pour un total de CHF 20'250.- du matériel informatique et un lot d'ouvrages techniques;
apport accepté pour le prix de CHF 20'000.- en échange duquel sont remises à l'apporteur les 20 parts de CHF 1'000.- qui constituent le capital.
Prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC. Communications de la société aux associés par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration de l'associé-gérant du 15.02.2008, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Personnes inscrites:
Molière, Jérôme, citoyen français, à Saint-Just (F), associé-gérant et président, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.--;
Dubuis, Florian, de Sierre et Savièse, à Martigny, gérant, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.