Reports for Medicum Wesemlin AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Medicum Wesemlin AG
- Medicum Wesemlin AG is active in the industry «Operation of medical and dental practices» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- Medicum Wesemlin AG has 6 persons entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 21.10.2022. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- Medicum Wesemlin AG is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-372.342.470.
Management (6)
newest board members
Dr. Piet Gerrit van Spyk,
Bastienne Caroline Ellen Mattei-Wellensiek,
Matthias Albert Pfammatter,
Verena Judith Meyer-Mäder,
Doris Maria Suter-Gut
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Piet Gerrit van Spyk,
Bastienne Caroline Ellen Mattei-Wellensiek,
Matthias Albert Pfammatter,
Verena Judith Meyer-Mäder,
Claudia Mair
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.05.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.798.189-7
UID/VAT
CHE-372.342.470
Sector
Operation of medical and dental practices
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer medizinischen Gruppenpraxis; Erbringung von medizinischen Leistungen und weiteren Dienstleistungen im Gesundheitswesen; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Halten, Verwaltung, Belastung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Avanta Audit AG | Baar | 21.10.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OPES AG | Luzern | 11.05.2016 | 17.07.2022 | |
contrust finance ag | Luzern | 30.05.2014 | 10.05.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Medicum Wesmelin AG
- wpunkt AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Medicum Wesemlin AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005588178, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Medicum Wesemlin AG, in Luzern, CHE-372.342.470, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 18.07.2022, Publ. 1005522865).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Arnold, Robert, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Ennetbürgen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Doris Maria Suter-Gut oder Piet van Spyk;
Jakupovic, Admira, liechtensteinische Staatsangehörige, in Mauren (LI), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Doris Maria Suter-Gut oder Piet van Spyk.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
van Spyk, Piet Gerrit, von Herznach, in Luzern, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: van Spyk, Piet, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Mattei-Wellensiek, Bastienne Caroline Ellen, von Hauterive (FR), in Meggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Doris Maria Suter-Gut oder Piet Gerrit van Spyk;
Meyer-Mäder, Verena Judith, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Doris Maria Suter-Gut oder Piet Gerrit van Spyk;
Pfammatter, Matthias Albert, von Eischoll, in Meggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Doris Maria Suter-Gut oder Piet Gerrit van Spyk;
Mair, Claudia, von Dübendorf, in Zug, Geschäftsführerin, Vorsitzende der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Doris Maria Suter-Gut oder Piet Gerrit van Spyk;
AVANTA AUDIT AG (CHE-376.424.285) [ CH-170.3.042.838-9], in Baar, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005522865, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Medicum Wesemlin AG, in Luzern, CHE-372.342.470, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 06.01.2022, Publ. 1005373944).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
OPES AG (CHE-102.372.223), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005373944, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Medicum Wesemlin AG, in Luzern, CHE-372.342.470, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 25.11.2021, Publ. 1005342110).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bünter, Alain, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Doris Maria Suter-Gut oder Piet van Spyk.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.