About MEDIA1 Service AG
- MEDIA1 Service AG with its legal headquarters in Schaan is active. MEDIA1 Service AG operates in the sector «Production, rental and distribution of films and TV shows ».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 23.03.2015.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 23.03.2023.
- Denos Anstalt, Dr. Jäger & Dr. Eisel Ärzte AG, MEDIA HOLDING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Legal headquarters of the company
Schaan
Sector
Production, rental and distribution of films and TV shows
Purpose (Original language)
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist:, Produktion, Veranstaltung und Verbreitung eines privaten Fernsehprogramms gemäss Liechtensteinischem Mediengesetz (vom 19. Oktober 2005, LGBL 2005 Nr. 250); Durchführung aller Massnahmen zur Planung, Errichtung und technischen Ausstattung im Hinblick auf die Produktion des privaten Fernsehprogramms; Produktion von Medieninhalten mittels Texten, Grafiken, Filmen und EDV-Software; Verwaltung ihres Vermögens; Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmungen; sowie alle jene Tätigkeiten, die der Verwaltungsrat als im Interesse der Gesellschaft gelegen erachtet.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for MEDIA1 Service AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5375/2023, (1)
MEDIA1 Service AG, in Schaan, FL-0002.495.416-4, Aktiengesellschaft.
Publikationsorgan neu:
Landeszeitungen.
Publication number: 2561/2019, (1)
MEDIA1 Service AG, in Schaan, FL-0002.495.416-4.
Aktiengesellschaft Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung:
Lins, Sonja Michaela, StA: Liechtenstein, 9486 Schaanwald, Verwahrerin;
Heeb, Peter, StA: Schweiz, 5463 Wislikofen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
Woldt, Sandra, StA: Serbien, 9488 Schellenberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Djordjevic, Sandra];
Woldt, Bernd Richard, StA: Deutschland, 9488 Schellenberg, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
TERRA SANA TREUHAND UND VERWALTUNG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 9486 Schaanwald, Verwahrerin.
Publication number: 20238425, (1)
Handelsregister 26.06.2018, MEDIA1 Service AG, Schaan (FL-0002.495.416-4) Aktiengesellschaft Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung: TERRA SANA TREUHAND UND VERWALTUNG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 9486 Schaanwald, Revisionsstelle.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
Heeb, Peter, StA: Schweiz, 5463 Wislikofen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Ivo Kaufmann Treuhand und Verwaltung Anstalt, 9490 Vaduz, Revisionsstelle.