Address
Hauptstrasse 36
3800 Matten b. Interlaken
Reports for Mattenhof Resort AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Mattenhof Resort AG
- Mattenhof Resort AG from Matten b. Interlaken operates in the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses» and is active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 19.11.2004.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 22.09.2015. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company Mattenhof Resort AG is registered under the UID CHE-112.110.742.
- Companies with an identical address: NorthSouth Lyndice Bühler, Twin Paragliding GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.11.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Matten bei Interlaken
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.016.850-2
UID/VAT
CHE-112.110.742
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Das Halten und den Betrieb eines Hotels und damit zusammenhängende Aktivitäten. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Darlehen gewähren und Sicherheiten stellen, Grundstücke erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ARBA Treuhand AG | Interlaken | 22.09.2015 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T. Schweizer AG, Treuhand und Revision | Interlaken | 27.01.2010 | 21.09.2015 | |
Treuhand Zwahlen AG | Interlaken | 25.11.2004 | 26.01.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Mattenhof Resort AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2385909, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Mattenhof Resort AG, in Matten bei Interlaken, CHE-112.110.742, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 18 vom 27.01.2010, S. 4, Publ. 5462744).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
T. Schweizer AG, Treuhand und Revision (CH-092.3.002.275-0), in Interlaken, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ARBA Treuhand AG (CHE-106.212.452), in Muri bei Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 5462744, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Mattenhof Resort AG, in Matten bei Interlaken, CH-092.3.016.850-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 15.05.2009, S. 4, Publ. 5021714).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cheseaux-Burkhalter, Anne, von Montreux, in Dulliken, Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Treuhand Zwahlen AG, in Interlaken, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bühler, Peter T., von Matten bei Interlaken, in Matten bei Interlaken, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
T. Schweizer AG, Treuhand und Revision (CH-092.3.002.275-0), in Interlaken, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 5021714, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Mattenhof Resort AG, in Matten bei Interlaken, CH-092.3.016.850-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 16.09.2008, S. 4, Publ. 4653246).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Frei, André, von Ehrendingen, in Glattbrugg (Opfikon), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung (CEO), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bühler, Martin A., von Matten bei Interlaken, in Matten bei Interlaken, Delegierter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit der Präsidentin];
Bühler, Peter T., von Matten bei Interlaken, in Matten bei Interlaken, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit der Präsidentin].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.