Reports for Massa Investment AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Massa Investment AG
- Massa Investment AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of investment companies». The legal headquarters are in Chur.
- The management of the company Massa Investment AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 14.03.2019.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 10.06.2020. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-445.463.433.
- Albin Kistler AG, Zweigniederlassung Chur, Alinaria AG, Astrid Aschpurwis Stiftung have the same address as Massa Investment AG.
Management (2)
newest board members
Dr. Götz Wilfried Bechtolsheimer,
Ursula Laura Bechtolsheimer-Kipp
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Götz Wilfried Bechtolsheimer,
Ursula Laura Bechtolsheimer-Kipp
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.03.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Chur
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.013.048-5
UID/VAT
CHE-445.463.433
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Halten und das Verwalten von Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen jeder Art sowie den Handel mit Beteiligungen von Unternehmungen jeder Art; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Massa Investment AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004907351, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Massa Investment AG, in Chur, CHE-445.463.433, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 19.03.2019, Publ. 1004590870).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bechtolsheimer, Dr. Wilfried Otto, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Arosa, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bechtolsheimer, Ursula Laura, von Arosa, in Arosa, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bechtolsheimer, Dr. Götz Wilfried, von Arosa, in London (GB), Vizepräsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR01-1004590870, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Massa Investment AG, in Chur, CHE-445.463.433, Steinbruchstrasse 12, 7000 Chur, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
12.03.2019.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Halten und das Verwalten von Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen jeder Art sowie den Handel mit Beteiligungen von Unternehmungen jeder Art;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
1'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 13.03.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Bechtolsheimer, Dr. Wilfried Otto, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Arosa, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.