Address
Oberwilerstrasse 10
6062 Wilen (Sarnen)
Reports for LWB Global Partner GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LWB Global Partner GmbH
- LWB Global Partner GmbH has its legal headquarters in Wilen (Sarnen) and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Services regarding management consulting».
- The management of the company LWB Global Partner GmbH consists of one person.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 22.03.2018.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.544.525.
- 8sources GmbH, Aare Sustainable Investments GmbH, All Nature Friends AG have the same address as LWB Global Partner GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.10.2008
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Sarnen
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.4.003.173-5
UID/VAT
CHE-114.544.525
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen aller Art, vorwiegend in den Bereichen Unternehmens- und Wirtschaftsberatung für Privatpersonen sowie juristische Personen im Ausland. Nebenzwecke siehe Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- HAUSSMANN INTERNATIONAL GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LWB Global Partner GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4128459, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
LWB Global Partner GmbH, in Sarnen, CHE-114.544.525, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 04.07.2012, Publ. 6750002).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Perrotin, Laurent Raymond, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Freienbach, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bruni, Walter, von Amsoldingen, in Sarnen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, ].
Publication number: 6750002, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
HAUSSMANN INTERNATIONAL GmbH, in Sarnen, CH-140.4.003.173-5, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 26.03.2012, S. 0, Publ. 6610714).
Statutenänderung:
25.06.2012.
Firma neu:
LWB Global Partner GmbH.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pieretti, Aymeric, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lausanne, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Perrotin, Laurent Raymond, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bäch SZ (Freienbach), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Bäch SZ und mit 199 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 6610714, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
HAUSSMANN INTERNATIONAL GmbH, in Engelberg, CH-140.4.003.173-5, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 17.02.2011, S. 12, Publ. 6038114).
Statutenänderung:
19.10.2011.
Sitz neu:
Sarnen.
Domizil neu:
Oberwilerstrasse 10, 6062 Wilen (Sarnen).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bruni, Walter, von Amsoldingen, in Wilen (Sarnen), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher:in Eglisau].