Reports for Lupis Frischmarkt AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lupis Frischmarkt AG
- Lupis Frischmarkt AG has its legal headquarters in Hünenberg See, is active and operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- The management of the company Lupis Frischmarkt AG, which was founded on the 19.06.2008, consists of one person.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 24.11.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZG under the UID CHE-114.363.053.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.06.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hünenberg
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.032.303-5
UID/VAT
CHE-114.363.053
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führen von Detailhandelsgeschäften u.a. mit Frischprodukten sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lupis Frischmarkt AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005893138, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Lupis Frischmarkt AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-114.363.053, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 23.04.2019, Publ. 1004614732).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hauser, Stefan, von Wädenswil, in Wollerau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauser, Werner, von Wädenswil, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004614732, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Lupis Frischmarkt AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-114.363.053, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 25.06.2008, S.21, Publ. 4541252).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lupart, André, von Horw, in Meggen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schmid, Cristina, von Luzern, in Meggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauser, Werner, von Wädenswil, in Wädenswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Hauser, Stefan, von Wädenswil, in Wollerau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4541252, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Lupis Frischmarkt AG, in Hünenberg, CH-170.3.032.303-5, Luzernerstrasse 101, 6333 Hünenberg See, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
10.06.2008.
Zweck:
Führen von Detailhandelsgeschäften u.a. mit Frischprodukten sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 200'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 200'000.00.
Aktien:
2'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft des im Handelsregister eingetragenen Einzelunternehmens Lupart André, SPAR Markt, in Luzern (CH-100.1.019.481-0), gemäss Vertrag vom 10.06.2008 und Übernahmebilanz per 31.12.2007 mit Aktiven von CHF 1'231'241.50 und Passiven von CHF 620'244.23, wofür 2'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 ausgegeben und CHF 410'977.27 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Alle Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen rechtsgültig durch eingeschriebenen Brief an die letztgemeldete Adresse der Aktionäre.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 10.06.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Lupart, André, von Horw, in Meggen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schmid, Cristina, von Luzern, in Meggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.