Address
c/o Reto Christian Müller
Löwenstrasse 13
6004 Luzern
Reports for LuMed AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LuMed AG
- LuMed AG is active in the industry «Research and development» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- The company was founded on 21.10.2004 and has 5 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 22.12.2022.
- LuMed AG is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-112.048.971.
- On the same address as LuMed AG there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Luzerner Qualitäts-Partner AG, Swiss Corner-Fresco GmbH, Zahnarztpraxis am Löwenplatz AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Chy Meng Ing,
Yvonne Peter,
Reto Christian Müller,
Dr. Anne Sybil Götschi
newest authorized signatories
Chy Meng Ing,
Yvonne Peter,
Nicole Schönenberger,
Reto Christian Müller,
Dr. Anne Sybil Götschi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.10.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.028.586-1
UID/VAT
CHE-112.048.971
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung und Betrieb von umfassenden medizinischen Versorgungsmodellen nach dem Hausarztprinzip, insbesondere Abwicklung von Verträgen nach dem Prinzip prospektiver Versicherungspauschalen; Erbringung von Dienstleistungen für ÄrztInnen, andere LeistungserbringerInnen, PatientInnen und Kostenträger.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Argo Consilium AG | Stäfa | 27.10.2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LuMed AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005635631, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
LuMed AG, in Luzern, CHE-112.048.971, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 03.10.2018, Publ. 1004467989).
Domizil neu:
c/o Reto Christian Müller, Löwenstrasse 13, 6004 Luzern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wigger, Eric, von Sursee, in Malters, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Studer-Merkle, Ute, von Luzern, in Luzern, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ing, Chy Meng, von Adligenswil, in Luzern, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Peter, Yvonne, von Adligenswil, in Adligenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schönenberger, Nicole, von Kirchberg (SG), in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004467989, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
LuMed AG, in Luzern, CHE-112.048.971, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 26.08.2015, Publ. 2339401).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lischer, Andreas, von Luzern, in Kriens, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wigger, Eric, von Sursee, in Malters, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Ing, Chy Meng, von Adligenswil, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2339401, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
LuMed AG, in Luzern, CHE-112.048.971, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 205 vom 23.10.2013, Publ. 1141835).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
van Spyk, Piet, von Herznach, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wigger, Eric, von Sursee, in Malters, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Argo Consilium AG (CHE-106.829.049), in Stäfa, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Argo Consilium AG, in Stäfa (CH-020.3.007.776-8)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.