Reports for Lüpold Reinigungen GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lüpold Reinigungen GmbH
- Lüpold Reinigungen GmbH has its legal headquarters in Biel/Bienne and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Cleaning of buildings».
- The company was founded on 03.02.2009 and has 3 persons in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 02.06.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-114.703.812.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: Kummer Import, Lüpold Holding GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.02.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Biel/Bienne
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.4.043.984-2
UID/VAT
CHE-114.703.812
Sector
Cleaning of buildings
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Erbringen von Reinigungsarbeiten aller Art sowie die Vornahme von Hauswartsdiensten. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder errichten, Grundstücke erwerben verkaufen und belasten, sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, welche geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FISTRA AG | Grenchen | 06.11.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Strasser AG | Biel/Bienne | 09.02.2009 | 05.11.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lüpold Reinigungen GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005758894, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lüpold Reinigungen GmbH, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-114.703.812, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2022, Publ. 1005570532).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ackermann-Lüpold, Marc, von Möriken-Wildegg, in Mörigen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Lüpold, Marc, in Biel/Bienne].
Publication number: HR02-1005570532, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lüpold Reinigungen GmbH, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-114.703.812, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 215 vom 06.11.2018, Publ. 1004491507).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kaynar, Onur, von Biel/Bienne, in Biel/Bienne, mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Della Pietra, Yannick, von Bosco/Gurin, in Nidau, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: HR02-1004491507, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lüpold Reinigungen GmbH, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-114.703.812, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 25.07.2017, Publ. 3663813).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lüpold, Hans-Jörg, von Möriken-Wildegg, in Ipsach, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Lüpold-Sägesser, Wanda, von Möriken-Wildegg, in Ipsach, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Treuhand Strasser AG (CHE-420.369.605), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüpold Holding GmbH (CHE-236.609.814), in Biel/Bienne, Gesellschafterin, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Lüpold, Marc, von Möriken-Wildegg, in Biel/Bienne, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Fistra AG Grenchen (CHE-103.445.178), in Grenchen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.