Address
c/o Kooger & Mottard, avocats
Rue Pedro-Meylan 1
1208 Genève
Reports for LowLand Participations SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LowLand Participations SA
- LowLand Participations SA has its legal headquarters in Genève and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 29.05.2012.
- The last commercial register change was made on 03.08.2020. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the company LowLand Participations SA is registered under the UID CHE-288.897.371.
- There are 65 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: ad-awards.com sàrl, Alma Family Office Sàrl, AMAS PRIVATE TRUST COMPANY SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.05.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.550.274-2
UID/VAT
CHE-288.897.371
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Acquisition, détention, gestion et vente de participations dans toutes sociétés et entreprises suisses ou étrangères, étant précisé que toute acquisition de participations dans des sociétés ayant des biens immobiliers en Suisse ne pourra avoir lieu que si ces biens immobiliers ont une affectation exclusivement commerciale (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LowLand Participations SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004950795, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
LowLand Participations SA, à Genève, CHE-288.897.371 (FOSC du 16.09.2015, p. 0/2375733).
But modifié:
acquisition, détention, gestion et vente de participations dans toutes sociétés et entreprises suisses ou étrangères, étant précisé que toute acquisition de participations dans des sociétés ayant des biens immobiliers en Suisse ne pourra avoir lieu que si ces biens immobiliers ont une affectation exclusivement commerciale (cf. statuts pour but complet). Conversion des 100'000 actions de CHF 1, jusqu'ici au porteur, en actions nominatives.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 100'000 actions de CHF 1, nominatives. Nouveaux statuts du 24.07.2020.
Publication number: 2375295, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
LowLand Participations SA, à Châtel-Saint-Denis, CHE-288.897.371 (FOSC du 01.06.2015, p. 0/2178721). Cette entité juridique est radiée du registre du commerce du canton de Fribourg par suite du transfert du siège à Genève.
Publication number: 2375733, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
LowLand Participations SA, précédemment à Châtel-Saint-Denis, CHE-288.897.371 (FOSC du 01.06.2015, p. 0/2178721).
Nouveau siège:
Genève, rue Pedro-Meylan 1, c/o Kooger & Mottard, avocats, 1208 Genève.
Communication aux actionnaires:
Feuille Officielle Suisse du Commerce ou par n'importe quel moyen de transmission écrit s'ils sont tous connus. Nouveaux statuts du 27.08.2015. Kooger Howard Jan est maintenant domicilié à Thônex.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.