Reports for Loisirs Brig-Glis SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Loisirs Brig-Glis SA
- Loisirs Brig-Glis SA has its legal headquarters in Gamsen, is active and operates in the sector «Other services: entertainment and recreation».
- Loisirs Brig-Glis SA has 2 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 07.10.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company Loisirs Brig-Glis SA is registered under the UID CHE-114.682.541.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.01.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Brig-Glis
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.3.013.628-5
UID/VAT
CHE-114.682.541
Sector
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Freizeitcenters für Bowling, Karting und andere Spiele in der Gemeinde Brig-Glis. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmen mit gleichem oder ähnlichem Zweck beteiligen oder solche gründen. Kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fun Planet Loisirs Brig-Glis AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Loisirs Brig-Glis SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005307676, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fun Planet Loisirs Brig-Glis AG, in Brig-Glis, CHE-114.682.541, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 10.05.2021, Publ. 1005176130).
Statutenänderung:
22.09.2021.
Firma neu:
Loisirs Brig-Glis SA.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich (Brief, Telefax oder E-Mail), sofern die Namen und Adressen der Aktionäre bekannt sind, andernfalls durch Veröffentlichung im Schweizerischen Handelsamtsblatt. [gestrichen: Die Inhaberaktien sind am 01.05.2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Die Statuten der Gesellschaft sind noch nicht an die Umwandlung angepasst worden;
die Anpassung muss anlässlich der nächsten Statutenänderung erfolgen.]. [Die übrigen Änderungen betreffen die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen nicht.]
Publication number: HR02-1004553653, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fun Planet Loisirs Brig-Glis AG, in Brig-Glis, CHE-114.682.541, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 10.02.2017, Publ. 3341077).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Perroud, Patrick Nicolas, von Savièse, in Nyon, Mitglied, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Luyet, Yves Sébastien, von Savièse, in St-Germain (Savièse), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3341077, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fun Planet Loisirs Brig-Glis AG, in Brig-Glis, CHE-114.682.541, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 51 vom 15.03.2010, S. 20, Publ. 5541698).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Perroud, Patrick Nicolas, von Savièse, in Nyon, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Perroud, Patrick, in Verbier (Bagnes)];
Perroud-Ritz, Florence Véronique, von Savièse, in Mies, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Perroud, Florence, von Savièse und Balgach, in Verbier (Bagnes)];
Luyet, Yves Sébastien, von Savièse, in St-Germain (Savièse), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Luyet, Yves].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.