Address
c/o Arnaud Loichat
Route du Traux 23
1913 Saillon
Reports for Loichat Aeronautics Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Loichat Aeronautics Sàrl
- Loichat Aeronautics Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Saillon and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company Loichat Aeronautics Sàrl consists of 4 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 16.06.2023.
- The company Loichat Aeronautics Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-439.674.743.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.07.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Saillon
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-645.4.116.444-8
UID/VAT
CHE-439.674.743
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Mandats et conseils en matière de suivis de navigabilité d'aéronefs, d'achat et de vente d'aéronefs, inspections et expertises et mise à disposition de personnel technique et de gestion liés à l'aéronautique, exploitation d'une école de pilotage et d'une entreprise de maintenance aéronautique.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Loichat Aeronautics Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005770962, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Loichat Aeronautics Sàrl, précédemment à La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-439.674.743, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 205 du 21.10.2022, Publ. 1005588723).
Modification des statuts:
13.03.2023.
Nouveau siège:
Saillon.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Arnaud Loichat, Route du Traux 23, 1913 Saillon. [biffé: Prestations accessoires, droits de préférence.
de préemption ou d'emption:
selon statuts.]. [biffé: Les modalités de transfert des parts sociales dérogent à la loi selon les statuts.].
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Loichat , Simon-Pierre Marcel (dit Simon), de Les Enfers, à Marsens, associé et président des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: à La Chaux-de-Fonds];
Loichat, Marie-Claire, de Les Enfers, à Marsens, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: à La Chaux-de-Fonds].
Publication number: HR02-1005771015, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Loichat Aeronautics Sàrl, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-439.674.743 (FOSC du 21.10.2022, p. 0/1005588723). Par suite du transfert de son siège à Saillon, la société est inscrite au registre du commerce du Bas-Valais. Par conséquent, elle est radiée d'office du registre du commerce de Neuchâtel.
Publication number: HR02-1005588723, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Loichat Aeronautics Sàrl, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-439.674.743 (FOSC du 20.07.2017, p. 0/3657501).
But modifié:
mandats et conseils en matière de suivis de navigabilité d'aéronefs, d'achat et de vente d'aéronefs, inspections et expertises et mise à disposition de personnel technique et de gestion liés à l'aéronautique, exploitation d'une école de pilotage et d'une entreprise de maintenance aéronautique. Statuts modifiés le 06.10.2022. Loichat Arnaud, maintenant domicilié à Saillon, jusqu'ici gérant et président, n'exerce plus la signature sociale. Il a cédé 30 de ses 180 parts sociales de CHF 100 à Loichat Gabrielle, de Champtauroz, à Saillon, nouvelle associée, laquelle elle n'exerce pas la signature sociale. Loichat Simon-Pierre Marcel (dit Simon), gérant, nommé président, continue de signer individuellement.
Nouvelle adresse:
rue de l'Arc-en-Ciel 16, c/o Simon-Pierre Marcel Loichat, 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.