Address
c/o Martin Schneider
Wingert 1
7204 Untervaz
Reports for LKG Untervaz, Genossenschaft
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LKG Untervaz, Genossenschaft
- LKG Untervaz, Genossenschaft in Untervaz is a Cooperative from the sector «Trading with various goods». LKG Untervaz, Genossenschaft is active.
- The management of the organization LKG Untervaz, Genossenschaft, which was founded on the 03.02.1937, consists of 4 persons.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 25.06.2018. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the organization LKG Untervaz, Genossenschaft is registered under the UID CHE-107.865.817.
Management (4)
newest members of the administration
Bruno Krättli,
Martin Schneider,
Daniel Solenthaler,
Adrian Krättli
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.02.1937
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Untervaz
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.5.000.171-7
UID/VAT
CHE-107.865.817
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zur Hauptsache Führung von Konsumwarenläden in gemeinsamer Selbsthilfe.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- LKG Untervaz
- Landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Untervaz
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LKG Untervaz, Genossenschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4311671, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
LKG Untervaz, Genossenschaft, in Untervaz, CHE-107.865.817, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 24.03.2011, Publ. 6089666).
Domizil neu:
c/o Martin Schneider, Wingert 1, 7204 Untervaz.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Clopath-Ludwig, Sabina, von Untervaz, in Untervaz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vogel, Vera, von Arvigo, in Untervaz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schiele, Kurt, von Beckenried, in Igis, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krättli, Bruno, von Untervaz, in Untervaz, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 6089666, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
LKG Untervaz, Genossenschaft, in Untervaz, CH-350.5.000.171-7, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 09.11.2009, S. 10, Publ. 5333780).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hedinger, Roland, von Wilchingen, in Untervaz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schneider-Fuchs, Lydia, von Rüthi SG, in Untervaz, Mitglied und Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krättli, Adrian, von Untervaz, in Untervaz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schneider, Martin, von Rüthi SG, in Untervaz, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vogel, Vera, von Arvigo, in Untervaz, Mitglied und Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5333780, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
LKG Untervaz, in Untervaz, CH-350.5.000.171-7, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2006, S. 7, Publ. 3568958).
Statutenänderung:
5.06.2009.
Firma neu:
LKG Untervaz, Genossenschaft.
Haftung/Nachschusspflicht neu:
Haftung: Gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten. [bisher: Statutarisch umschriebene persönliche und solidarische Haftung bis zum Betrage von CHF 2 000.].
Pflichten:
Gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten. [bisher: Beschränkte Nachschusspflicht jedes Genossenschafters bis zum Betrage von CHF 2 000.].
Mitteilungen:
Mitteilungen an die Mitglieder erfolgen grundsätzlich schriftlich oder anlässlich von Generalversammlungen. Gemäss Erklärung der Verwaltung vom 04.05.2009 untersteht die Genossenschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lipp-Büchel, Regula Heidi, von Untervaz, in Untervaz, Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krättli, Adrian, von Untervaz, in Untervaz, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident];
Solenthaler, Daniel, von Urnäsch, in Untervaz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.