Reports for LeSuperbe Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LeSuperbe Immobilien AG
- LeSuperbe Immobilien AG has its legal headquarters in Hünenberg See and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management has 7 active persons registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 15.02.2022.
- LeSuperbe Immobilien AG is registered in the Canton of ZG under the UID CHE-271.942.974.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: LeSuperbe AG, LeSuperbe Services AG, Lustenberger & Dürst AG.
Management (7)
newest board members
Felix Mathias Stocker,
Markus Speck,
Renato Eugster,
Roberto Andrea Schlatter,
Richard Walter Gander
newest authorized signatories
Felix Mathias Stocker,
Markus Speck,
Renato Eugster,
Martin Josef Lussi,
Roberto Andrea Schlatter
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.01.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hünenberg
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.040.259-9
UID/VAT
CHE-271.942.974
CHE-319.223.561 VAT
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Halten und Veräusserung von Grundstücken im In- und Ausland sowie Einräumung von Nutzungsrechten aller Art an solchen Grundstücken; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CONVISA Revisions AG | Schwyz | 22.01.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- LeSuperbe Immobilien Ltd
- LeSuperbe Immobilien SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LeSuperbe Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005405833, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
LeSuperbe Immobilien AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-271.942.974, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 147 vom 02.08.2021, Publ. 1005262575).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Holzer, Christian, von Moosseedorf, in Wittnau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lustenberger, Martin, von Sursee, in Villars-sur-Glâne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tschirren, Walter, von Niedermuhlern, in Oberhofen am Thunersee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Speck, Markus, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Rapperswil-Jona, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stocker, Felix, von Buttisholz, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005262575, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
LeSuperbe Immobilien AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-271.942.974, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 02.07.2020, Publ. 1004926585).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eugster, Renato, von Vaz/Obervaz, in Cham, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lussi, Martin, von Stans, in Baar, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Prokurist, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004926585, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
LeSuperbe Immobilien AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-271.942.974, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 22.01.2016, S.0, Publ. 2614677).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eugster, Renato, von Vaz/Obervaz, in Cham, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lustenberger, Martin, von Sursee, in Villars-sur-Glâne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schlatter, Roberto, von Basel, in Dornach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.