Reports for Les Terrasses du Valais Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Les Terrasses du Valais Sàrl
- Les Terrasses du Valais Sàrl is currently active and the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties». The legal headquarters are in Sion.
- The company was founded on 12.05.2016 and has 4 persons in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 15.11.2022.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VS is CHE-180.886.297.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.05.2016
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.4.017.114-2
UID/VAT
CHE-180.886.297
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'achat, la vente, l'échange, la promotion, le développement, la construction pour son compte ou pour le compte de tiers de biens mobiliers et immobiliers ainsi que tous travaux d'architecture, l'établissement de plans de quartier, le lotissement, l'exploitation, la gérance, la location, le courtage, le financement d'immeubles, la participation à toutes sociétés de la branche immobilière (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Les Terrasses du Valais Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005604950, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Les Terrasses du Valais Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-180.886.297, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 34 du 19.02.2018, Publ. 4064529).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
JR Management Sàrl (CHE-348.526.727), à Sion, associée, pour 48 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: RCI Roux Courtage Immobilier Sàrl (CHE-348.526.727)];
Reynard, Caroline, de Anniviers, à Chippis, présidente des gérants, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: gérante, avec signature individuelle];
Roux, Julien, de Grimisuat, à Vétroz, gérant, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 4064529, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Les Terrasses du Valais Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-180.886.297, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 216 du 07.11.2017, Publ. 3854287).
Modification des statuts:
09.02.2018.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
AZ Conseils Sàrl (CHE-114.752.472), à Sion, associée, pour 48 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Hoirie de feu Alban Reynard, composée de Caroline Reynard et de Clara Reynard, associée, pour 104 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00];
RCI Roux Courtage Immobilier Sàrl (CHE-348.526.727), à Sion, associée, pour 48 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 3854287, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Les Terrasses du Valais Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-180.886.297, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 94 du 18.05.2016, Publ. 2837269).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Reynard, Alban, de Savièse, à Sion, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Hoirie de feu Alban Reynard, composée de Caroline Reynard et de Clara Reynard, associée, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00;
Reynard, Caroline, de Anniviers, à Chippis, gérante, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.