Address
c/o Sareco Sàrl, succursale de Châtel-Saint-Denis
Avenue de la Gare 38
1618 Châtel-St-Denis
Reports for Les Terrasses d'Ogoz SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Les Terrasses d'Ogoz SA
- Les Terrasses d'Ogoz SA with its legal headquarters in Châtel-St-Denis is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Les Terrasses d'Ogoz SA is active.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 02.04.1998.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 18.06.2020.
- The company is registered in the commercial register FR under the UID CHE-104.489.563.
- On the same address there are 26 other active companies registered. These include: ACM Holding Sàrl, Artinil SA, Darya Sàrl.
Management (3)
newest board members
Eric Garoyan,
David Jonathan Matthew Charles Pfenniger,
Rémy Pfenniger
newest authorized signatories
Eric Garoyan,
David Jonathan Matthew Charles Pfenniger,
Rémy Pfenniger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.04.1998
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Pont-en-Ogoz
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-645.1.006.050-6
UID/VAT
CHE-104.489.563
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, vente et gérance de biens immobiliers.
Auditor
Former auditor (7)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidesco Sàrl | Lausanne | 20.01.2020 | 17.06.2020 | |
Sareco Sàrl | Villeneuve (VD) | 12.12.2012 | 01.10.2019 | |
Verifid Révision SA | Genève | 28.09.2011 | 11.12.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Immo Vision S.A. en liquidation
- Immo Vision S.A.
- Immo Vision SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Les Terrasses d'Ogoz SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004913755, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Les Terrasses d'Ogoz SA, à Pont-en-Ogoz, CHE-104.489.563 (FOSC du 20.01.2020, p. 0/1004808885).
Capital-actions nouveau:
CHF 500'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 5'000 actions de CHF 100, nominatives (jusqu'ici: 5'000 actions de CHF 100, au porteur). Restriction de transmissibilité des actions selon statuts. Statuts modifiés le 02.04.2020.
Personne radiée:
Fidesco Sàrl (CHE-113.439.044), organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 02.04.2020, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Publication number: HR02-1004808885, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Les Terrasses d'Ogoz SA, à Pont-en-Ogoz, CHE-104.489.563 (FOSC du 02.10.2019, p. 0/1004728353).
Nouvel organe de révision:
Fidesco Sàrl (CHE-113.439.044), à Lausanne.
Publication number: HR02-1004728353, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Les Terrasses d'Ogoz SA, à Pont-en-Ogoz, CHE-104.489.563 (FOSC du 10.10.2017, p. 0/3800251). Sareco SA (CH-550-0092492-2) n'est plus organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.