Address
Route de Bière, Les Délices 20
1143 Apples
Reports for Léman Granulats SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Léman Granulats SA
- Léman Granulats SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Apples. Léman Granulats SA belongs to the industry «Mining of stones and earth» and is currently active.
- The management has 7 active persons registered.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 31.07.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Léman Granulats SA is registered under the UID CHE-103.063.658.
Management (7)
newest board members
Nicolas Moinat,
Pascal Alphonse Doutaz,
Frederic Michoud,
David Martini,
Didier Math
newest authorized signatories
Nicolas Moinat,
Pascal Alphonse Doutaz,
Frederic Michoud,
Antoine Asfaux,
David Martini
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.04.1979
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hautemorges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.137.840-8
UID/VAT
CHE-103.063.658
Sector
Mining of stones and earth
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'exploitation d'une ou plusieurs gravières, carrières, dépôts d'excavations et décharges (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidacor SA | Morges | 04.05.2011 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidacor Fiduciaire et Gérance Sàrl | Morges | <2004 | 03.05.2011 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Léman Granulats SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006098169, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Léman Granulats SA, à Hautemorges, CHE-103.063.658 (FOSC du 31.10.2023, p. 0/1005873375). Math Didier est maintenant de Saint-Livres. Statuts modifiés le 28.06.2024.
Publication number: HR02-1005873375, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Léman Granulats SA, à Hautemorges, CHE-103.063.658 (FOSC du 19.01.2023, p. 0/1005656905). Moinat Nicolas, de Lavigny, à Grancy, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux, pas avec Moinat Raymond.
Publication number: HR02-1005656905, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Léman Granulats SA, à Hautemorges, CHE-103.063.658 (FOSC du 19.04.2022, p. 0/1005453217). Dumuid Jean-Michel n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.