Reports for Le Cellier de Saint-Pierre Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Le Cellier de Saint-Pierre Sàrl
- Le Cellier de Saint-Pierre Sàrl is currently active and the industry «Trading in food products». The legal headquarters are in Lausanne.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 18.12.1998.
- On the 29.07.2009 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-104.984.874.
- Companies with an identical address: AVECSIS Vertesi Solutions, Bureau d'architecture Sylvie Pfaehler, Deux points à la ligne SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.12.1998
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.154.765-6
UID/VAT
CHE-104.984.874
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce de tout produit, notamment de produits liés aux vins.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ACOR CADRES S.à r.l.
- ACOR CADRES Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Le Cellier de Saint-Pierre Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5168156, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Le Cellier de Saint-Pierre Sàrl, à Lausanne, CH-550-0154765-6, commerce de tout produit, notamment de produits liés aux vins (FOSC du 29.11.2005, p. 14/3125738). Selon déclaration du gérant du 29 juin 2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Publication number: 3125738, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ACOR CADRES S.à r.l., à Lausanne, CH-550-0154765-6, recherche et sélection de personnel (FOSC du 23.10.2003, p. 11). Statuts modifiés le 18 novembre 2005.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Le Cellier de Saint-Pierre Sàrl.
Nouveau but:
commerce de tout produit, notamment de produits liés aux vins.
Publication number: 1227982, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ACOR CADRES S.à r.l., à Lausanne, recherche et sélection de personnel, en particulier de cadres (FOSC du 26.11.2002, p. 14). Gauthey Bernard, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède sa part de CHF 18'000 à Anselmo Vincenzo, d'Urdorf, à Servion, associé-gérant avec signature individuelle. Sands Joseph, qui n'est plus associé, a cédé sa part de CHF 2'000 à Spurio Luciano, d'Italie, à Lausanne, associé.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.