Head office
Other branches (4)
Reports for Lazzarini AG, Zweigniederlassung Buchs
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lazzarini AG, Zweigniederlassung Buchs
- Lazzarini AG, Zweigniederlassung Buchs has its legal headquarters in Buchs SG and is active. It is a Branch with head office in Switzerland and active in the industry «General structural engineering».
- The company was founded on 26.08.1993 and has 0 persons in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 31.08.2009, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-376.735.153.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.08.1993
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Buchs (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.9.036.055-4
UID/VAT
CHE-376.735.153
CHE-105.769.143 VAT
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
[gestrichen]. Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung: [Löschung des Zweckes und der Personen von Amtes wegen gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- G. Lazzarini & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Buchs, vormals Gebr. Gantenbein AG., Hoch- und Tiefbau
- Lazzarini G. & Co AG, Zweigniederlassung Buchs, vormals Gebr. Gantenbein AG, Hoch- und Tiefbau
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lazzarini AG, Zweigniederlassung Buchs
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5221500, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
G. Lazzarini & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Buchs, vormals Gebr. Gantenbein AG., Hoch- und Tiefbau, in Buchs SG, CH-320.9.036.055-4, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 22.04.2008, S. 11, Publ. 4440618).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Samedan.
Firma neu:
Lazzarini AG, Zweigniederlassung Buchs.
Firma Hauptsitz neu:
Lazzarini AG [bisher: Firma des Hauptsitzes: G. Lazzarini & Co. AG].
Publication number: 4440618, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
G. Lazzarini & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Buchs, vormals Gebr. Gantenbein AG., Hoch- und Tiefbau, in Buchs SG, CH-320.9.036.055-4, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 110 vom 11.06.2007, S. 14, Publ. 3969416).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Samedan.
Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz neu:
CH-350.3.002.115-7.
Zweck Hauptsitz:
[gestrichen].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung:
[Löschung des Zweckes und der Personen von Amtes wegen gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hatz, Dr. Hans, von Chur und Calfreisen, in Chur, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rusca, Dr. Jan, von Locarno, in Maienfeld, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Crufer, Mario, von Domat/Ems, in Domat/Ems, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rusca-Lazzarini, Emerita, von Locarno, in Maienfeld, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Crameri, Camillo, von Poschiavo, in Celerina/Schlarigna, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Dal Ponte, Franz, von Berneck, in Werdenberg (Grabs), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Giannini, Marco, von Quinto, in Chur, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Tobler, Peter, von Stein SG, in Chur, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Christoffel-Spescha, Alice, von Riein und Andiast, in Tamins, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Clalüna, Sonja, von Ardez, in Samedan, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Gervasi, Franco, von Poschiavo, in Celerina/Schlarigna, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Zala, Siro, von Brusio, in Domat/Ems, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Hug, Markus, von Quarten, in Mols (Quarten), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Kehl, Daniel, von Balgach, in Gams, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Giovanoli, Claudio, von Soglio, in Rothenbrunnen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Foffa, Elmar, von Müstair, in Domat/Ems, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Mosca, Mario, von Sent, in Ramosch, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Graf, Niklaus, von Oberuzwil, in Haag (Rheintal) (Sennwald), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Ackermann, Michael, von Mels, in Mels, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Walker, Alfred, von Gurtnellen, in Zug, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lorenzini, Gian Luca, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Untereggen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Domenig, Daniel, von Tamins, in Samedan, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Capelli, Marco, von Poschiavo, in Davos Platz (Davos), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gredig, Christian, von Safien, in Chur, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mettier, Christian, von Langwies, in Chur, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bauer, Roger, von Nesslau-Krummenau, in Flawil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Brugger, Rolf, von Weinfelden, in Buchs SG, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Jörimann, Peter, von Tamins, in Tamins, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 3969416, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
G. Lazzarini & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Buchs, vormals Gebr. Gantenbein AG., Hoch- und Tiefbau, in Buchs SG, CH-320.9.036.055-4, Betrieb einer Bauunternehmung usw. Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 25.04.2007, S. 11, Publ. 3901650).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Samedan.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Michel, Arno, von Susch, in Samedan, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.