Reports for Lanker Baumanagement AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lanker Baumanagement AG
- Lanker Baumanagement AG from St. Gallen operates in the sector «General structural engineering» and is active.
- The management of the company Lanker Baumanagement AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 27.01.1976.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 19.04.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-105.852.270.
- Bollhalder Elektro-Consulting, Eberle Architektur, Eberle Architektur GmbH are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.01.1976
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.005.549-7
UID/VAT
CHE-105.852.270
CHE-229.960.465 VAT
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen im Baumanagement. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Lanker Landmaschinen AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lanker Baumanagement AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005152697, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lanker Baumanagement AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-105.852.270, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 220 vom 13.11.2018, S.0, Publ. 1004496637).
Statutenänderung:
14.04.2021.
Aktien neu:
1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 [bisher: 1'000 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 100.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief an die letzte bekannte Adresse im Aktienregister. Es obliegt den Aktionären Ihre Adresse der Gesellschaft bekannt zu geben. [Streichung des Tatbestandes betreffend Sitzverlegung aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften.] [gestrichen: Die vor der Eintragung im Handelsregister des Kantons St. Gallen gestrichenen Tatsachen, sowie allfällige frühere Statutendaten oder Tagebuch- und SHAB-Zitate können im Registerauszug des bisherigen Sitzes, welcher bei den abgelegten Handelsregisterakten liegt, eingesehen werden.]
Publication number: HR02-1004496637, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lanker Baumanagement AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-105.852.270, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 01.07.2016, Publ. 2926497).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Casciaro, Gianfranco, von Egnach, in Mattwil (Birwinken), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bollhalder, Peter, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Rorschacherberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Hobi, Nadia, von Mels, in Goldach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2926497, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lanker Baumanagement AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-105.852.270, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 27.02.2014, Publ. 1369683).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hobi, Nadia, von Mels, in Goldach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Casciaro, Gianfranco, von Egnach, in Mattwil (Birwinken), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.