Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for LANDI THURLAND, Genossenschaft
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.07.1887
Deletion from the commercial register
30.05.2022
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Gachnang
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.5.000.235-5
UID/VAT
CHE-105.897.752
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung der wirtschaftlichen Verhältnisse ihrer Mitglieder in Zusammenarbeit mit der fenaco mit Sitz in Bern, insbesondere durch Versorgung der Landwirtschaft und weiterer Kreise mit Produktionsmitteln, Verbrauchsgütern und Dienstleistungen insbesondere in diesen Bereichen, durch Abnahme und Vermarktung der landwirtschaftlichen Erzeugnisse und durch Weiterbildung der Mitglieder.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Bern | 21.07.2017 | 29.05.2022 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 03.07.2008 | 20.07.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Landi Thurland, Genossenschaft
- Landwirtschaftliche Konsumgenossenschaft Gundetswil-Islikon.
- Landi am Iselisberg
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LANDI THURLAND, Genossenschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005484350, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
LANDI THURLAND, Genossenschaft, in Gachnang, CHE-105.897.752, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 27.12.2021, Publ. 1005368942). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die LANDI THULA, Genossenschaft, in Matzingen (CHE-105.776.054), über. Die Genossenschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005368942, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
LANDI THURLAND, Genossenschaft, in Gachnang, CHE-105.897.752, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 12.08.2020, Publ. 1004956500).
Statutenänderung:
30.11.2021.
Anteilscheine neu:
CHF 1'000.00.
Haftung/Nachschusspflicht neu:
[Streichung des Eintrags aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften.] [gestrichen: Ohne persönliche Haftung].
Pflichten neu:
Jeder Genossenschafter ist verpflichtet, mindestens einen Anteilschein zu CHF 1'000.00 zu übernehmen. [Streichung des Eintrags aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften.] [gestrichen: Nachschusspflicht: ohne Nachschusspflicht.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Widmer, Markus, von Langrickenbach, in Gachnang, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004956500, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
LANDI THURLAND, Genossenschaft, in Gachnang, CHE-105.897.752, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 21.07.2017, Publ. 3659771).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brägger, Alex, von Kirchberg SG, in Uesslingen (Uesslingen-Buch), Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tschirky, Daniel, von Mels, in Gündlikon (Bertschikon), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Friedinger, Christoph, von Sirnach, in Frauenfeld (Matzingen), Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Bühler, Markus, von Graben, in Pfyn, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Roos, Andreas, von Schänis, in Uesslingen (Uesslingen-Buch), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.