Reports for Lampart Immobilien GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lampart Immobilien GmbH
- Lampart Immobilien GmbH is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Buttisholz.
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 20.09.2010.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-101.198.224.
Management (3)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Markus Paul Lampart,
Marie-Anna Christen,
Urs Xaver Christen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.01.2000
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Buttisholz
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.023.336-4
UID/VAT
CHE-101.198.224
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Kauf, Halten, Planung, Erstellung und Ausführung von Bauten und Anlagen sowie deren Vermietung und Verkauf; Handel mit Grundstücken; Halten von Beteiligungsrechten an anderen Gesellschaften; Erwerb, Bebauung, Belastung, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundeigentum; Beteiligungen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lampart Immobilien GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5817428, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lampart Immobilien GmbH, in Buttisholz, CH-100.4.023.336-4, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 216 vom 06.11.2008, S. 10, Publ. 4721608).
Statutenänderung:
11.09.2010.
Domizil neu:
St. Ottilienstrasse 59, 6018 Buttisholz.
Zweck neu:
Kauf, Halten, Planung, Erstellung und Ausführung von Bauten und Anlagen sowie deren Vermietung und Verkauf;
Handel mit Grundstücken;
Halten von Beteiligungsrechten an anderen Gesellschaften;
Erwerb, Bebauung, Belastung, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundeigentum;
Beteiligungen.
Mitteilungen:
Mitteilungen erfolgen schriftlich. [Weitere Aenderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lampart, Bruno, von Buttisholz, in Buttisholz, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.--.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lampart, Markus, von Buttisholz, in Buttisholz, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.-- [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer];
Christen, Urs, von Grosswangen und Luthern, in Buttisholz, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.--.
Publication number: 4721608, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lampart Immobilien GmbH, in Buttisholz, CH-100.4.023.336-4, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 02.09.2003, S. 9, Publ. 1153308). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 24.10.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Publication number: 1153308, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lampart Immobilien GmbH, in Buttisholz, Kauf, Halten, Planung, Erstellung und Ausführung von Bauten und Anlagen sowie deren Vermietung und Verkauf, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 28.01.2000, S. 627).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Christen, Urs, von Grosswangen und Luthern, in Buttisholz, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 10'000.--.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Christen, Marie-Anna, von Buttisholz, Grosswangen und Luthern, in Buttisholz, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 10'000.--.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.