Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Labor Dr. Rinderknecht AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.06.2009
Deletion from the commercial register
09.07.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.014.164-7
UID/VAT
CHE-114.920.315
Sector
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Labors zur medizinischen Diagnostik insbesondere im Gebiet der Zyto- und Histopathologie sowie die Erbringung damit zusammenhängender Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich daneben an anderen Unternehmen irgendwelcher Art im In- und Ausland beteiligen, solche gründen, übernehmen und mit ihnen fusionieren. Sie kann Liegenschaften und Immaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland erwerben, belasten und veräussern sowie durch Beschluss des Verwaltungsrates Zweigniederlassungen und Agenturen im In- oder Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Mahrer Treuhand AG | Möhlin | 26.11.2019 | 08.07.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Labor Dr. Rinderknecht AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: SR01-0000003585, Commercial Registry Office Geneva
Rubrique: Autres appels aux créanciers relevant du droit des sociétés Sous-rubrique: Appel aux créanciers suite à une fusion selon la LFus Date de publication: SHAB - 13.07.2020 Numéro de publication: Cantons: GE, BS, VD Entité de publication: Laurence Morand-Jacquemoud - Etude de Mes Jacques SAUTTER & Laurence JACQUEMOUD, Notaires Associés, Cours des Bastions 8, 1205 Genève Appel aux créanciers suite à une fusion selon la LFus Gynlab AG et Labor Dr. Rinderknecht AG avec Unilabs, Laboratoire d'analyses médicales SA
Point de contact: Unilabs, Laboratoire d'analyses médicales SA Chemin des Perrières 2
Publication number: HR03-1004933061, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Labor Dr. Rinderknecht AG, in Basel, CHE-114.920.315, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 26.11.2019, Publ. 1004768192). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die Unilabs, Laboratoire d'analyses médicales SA, in Coppet (CHE-107.745.308), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004768192, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Labor Dr. Rinderknecht AG, in Basel, CHE-114.920.315, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 19.07.2017, Publ. 3654165). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung der Gründer vom 12.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rinderknecht, Irene, von Basel, in Basel, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schlatter, Martin, von Schaffhausen, in Walchwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
De Voogd, Jan, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Morges, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mainil-Varlet, Pierre, belgischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Köver Schmidhauser, Pierre-François, von Dübendorf, in Bülach, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rinderknecht, Dr. Bernhard, von Hedingen und Basel, in Basel, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Mahrer Treuhand AG (CHE-105.607.718), in Möhlin, Revisionsstelle.