Reports for La Pierrette S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout La Pierrette S.A.
- La Pierrette S.A. has its legal headquarters in Le Brassus and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments».
- La Pierrette S.A. has 6 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 20.04.2022.
- The company's UID is CHE-101.491.664.
Management (6)
newest board members
Olivier André Laverrière,
Laurent Jean-Charles Bernasconi,
Michel Studer,
Remo Pavone,
Pascal Bratschi
newest authorized signatories
Bastien Droz,
Olivier André Laverrière,
Laurent Jean-Charles Bernasconi,
Michel Studer,
Remo Pavone
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.10.1982
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Le Chenit
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.077.532-8
UID/VAT
CHE-101.491.664
CHE-116.269.181 VAT
Sector
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrication et vente de pierres fines soignées pour l'horlogerie, l'industrie et la bijouterie, ainsi que toutes fabrications similaires et toutes opérations se rattachant directement ou indirectement à cette industrie. Usinage, assemblage et montage de toutes matières et composants se rattachant à l'électronique et à la micromécanique.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Genève | 28.06.2006 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Biel/Bienne | <2004 | 27.06.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- La Pierrette SA
- La Pierrette, Audemars & Meylan SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: La Pierrette S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005454573, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
La Pierrette S.A., à Le Chenit, CHE-101.491.664 (FOSC du 23.03.2022, p. 0/1005433945). La signature de Dall'Acqua Jean-Paul est radiée. Bernasconi Laurent et Laverrière Olivier continuent de signer collectivement à deux, désormais avec Bratschi Pascal, Pavone Remo, Studer Michel ou Droz Bastien. Studer Michel continue de signer collectivement à deux, désormais avec Bernasconi Laurent, Laverrière Olivier ou Droz Bastien. Signature collective à deux, avec Bratschi Pascal, Pavone Remo, Studer Michel, Bernasconi Laurent ou Laverrière Olivier est conférée à Droz Bastien, de Mont-Tramelan, à Milvignes, directeur général.
Publication number: HR02-1005433945, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
La Pierrette S.A., à Le Chenit, CHE-101.491.664 (FOSC du 29.09.2021, p. 0/1005301415). Querro Jean-Pierre n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Studer Michel continue à signer collectivement à deux, désormais avec Bernasconi Laurent, Laverrière Olivier ou Dall'Acqua Jean-Paul. Laverrière Olivier, de Troinex, à Viuz-en-Sallaz (France), est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux, avec Bratschi Pascal, Pavone Remo, Studer Michel ou Dall'Acqua Jean-Paul.
Publication number: HR02-1005301415, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
La Pierrette S.A., à Le Chenit, CHE-101.491.664 (FOSC du 06.08.2019, p. 0/1004690804). Bonard Jean-Marc et Vandini Alessandro ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Bernasconi Laurent, de Genève, à La Balme-de-Sillingy (France), avec signature collective à deux, avec Bratschi Pascal, Pavone Remo, Studer Michel ou Dall'Acqua Jean-Paul, et Studer Michel, de et à Lausanne, avec signature collective à deux, avec Bernasconi Laurent, Querro Jean-Pierre ou Dall'Acqua Jean-Paul, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.