Address
Strada Cantonale 11
6964 Davesco-Soragno
Reports for Kyema SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kyema SA
- Kyema SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Davesco-Soragno. Kyema SA belongs to the industry «IT services» and is currently active.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 04.01.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-114.258.060.
- On the same address as Kyema SA there are 5 other active companies registered. These include: AIM CONSULTING SA, DG Meetings & Events Sagl, Eforos Sagl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.04.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lugano
Commercial Registry Office
TI
Commercial register number
CH-501.3.010.518-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.258.060
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language)
La progettazione, l'esecuzione, la commercializzazione, l'installazione, la produzione e lo sviluppo di hardware, di software e di qualunque altro materiale tecnologico legato al mondo dell'informatica e della comunicazione. La concezione, la realizzazione, la gestione e la manutenzione di sistemi di rete di comunicazione, la consulenza nella definizione di strategie nell'informatica e delle reti, la realizzazione di sistemi multimediali, la vendita di sistemi per la telecomunicazione nonché la rappresentanza, la consulenzam la compravendita unita alla relativa assistenza e la formazione riguardante i prodotti sopraelencati e qualsiasi altro articolo elettronico. Può collaborare e partecipare con società del ramo, acquistare rappresentanze e operare all'estero.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CARUSO REVISIONE E CONSULENZA SAGL | Mendrisio | 04.04.2019 | 03.01.2024 | |
ALBA ADVISORS SA | Lugano | 09.11.2010 | 03.04.2019 | |
Consolida SA | Chiasso | 18.04.2008 | 08.11.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kyema SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005925698, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Kyema SA, in Lugano, CHE-114.258.060, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 97 del 21.05.2021, Pubbl. 1005189290). Secondo dichiarazione del 15.12.2023 la società non è soggetta alla revisione ordinaria e rinuncia a una revisione limitata.
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
CARUSO REVISIONE E CONSULENZA SAGL (CHE-460.221.498), in Mendrisio, ufficio di revisione.
Publication number: HR02-1005189290, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Complemento all'iscrizione del registro giornaliero no. 10'716 del 05.05.2021, pubblicata nel FUSC no. 89 del 10.05.2021. Kyema SA, in Lugano, CHE-114.258.060, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 89 del 10.05.2021, Pubbl. 1005175782).
Nuovo recapito:
Strada Cantonale 11, 6964 Davesco-Soragno.
Publication number: HR02-1005175782, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Kyema SA, in Lugano, CHE-114.258.060, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 66 del 04.04.2019, Pubbl. 1004603469).
Statuti modificati:
27.04.2021.
Nuove azioni:
1'000 azioni nominative da CHF 100.00 [finora: 1'000 azioni al portatore da CHF 100.00].
Nuove comunicazioni:
Le comunicazioni della società agli azionisti avvengono mediante avviso personale scritto.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Giorgetti, Danilo, da Stabio, in Canobbio, presidente, con firma collettiva a due [finora: in Lugano].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.