Reports for ECCO Europe AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ECCO Europe AG
- ECCO Europe AG is active in the industry «Trading in clothings» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Hünenberg.
- The management consists of 7 persons. The company was founded on 16.01.2009.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 19.07.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-114.674.317.
- ECCO Switzerland AG, HEAD Switzerland AG, KT Trading AG are registered at the same address.
Management (7)
newest board members
Henrik Heide Ottosen,
Thomas Meyer Goegsig,
Michael Krol,
Soren Dalsgaard Stier,
André Kasprzak
newest authorized signatories
Steen Flemming Lorents,
Casper Gram Hvejsel,
Henrik Heide Ottosen,
Thomas Meyer Goegsig,
Michael Krol
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.01.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hünenberg
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.033.048-3
UID/VAT
CHE-114.674.317
Sector
Trading in clothings
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Handel mit Waren, insbesondere den Gross- und Detailhandel in Europa mit Schuhen, Accessoires und Textilien sowie Management-Dienstleistungen, Schulung und Beratung auf diesem Gebiet. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zug | 23.04.2015 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zug | 29.03.2012 | 22.04.2015 | |
Acton Revisions AG | Zug | 22.01.2009 | 28.03.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ECCO Europe Ltd
- ECCO Europe SA
- KRM Ltd
- KRM SA
- KRM AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ECCO Europe AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089133, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
ECCO Europe AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-114.674.317, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 53 vom 15.03.2024, Publ. 1005986607).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Larsen, Simon Lajlev, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Walchwil, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Flemming Lorents, Steen, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Küssnacht (SZ), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hvejsel, Casper Gram, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Horgen, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005986607, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
ECCO Europe AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-114.674.317, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 03.07.2023, Publ. 1005784421).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hvejsel, Casper Gram, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Horgen, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Larsen, Simon Lajlev, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Walchwil, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005784421, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
ECCO Europe AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-114.674.317, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 10.06.2022, Publ. 1005492538).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Borch, Karsten, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in London (GB), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.