Reports for KREUZ Herzogenbuchsee Betriebs AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KREUZ Herzogenbuchsee Betriebs AG
- KREUZ Herzogenbuchsee Betriebs AG has its legal headquarters in Herzogenbuchsee and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of restaurants».
- KREUZ Herzogenbuchsee Betriebs AG has 4 persons entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 21.11.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-389.823.418.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: KREUZ Herzogenbuchsee Holding AG, KREUZ Herzogenbuchsee Immobilien AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Michael Schärer,
Eva Gauch-Ettlin,
Isabelle Burkhardt,
Marc André Guggenbühler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.01.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Herzogenbuchsee
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.065.949-9
UID/VAT
CHE-389.823.418
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer Gastronomie-, Event-, Bar-, Seminar- und Kulturstätte mit Hotelbetrieb. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des Inlandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gfeller + Partner AG | Langenthal | 25.01.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KREUZ Herzogenbuchsee Betriebs AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005889596, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
KREUZ Herzogenbuchsee Betriebs AG, in Herzogenbuchsee, CHE-389.823.418, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 25.07.2023, Publ. 1005803160).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Winten, Gustaaf Christiaan, belgischer Staatsangehöriger, in Burgdorf, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005803160, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
KREUZ Herzogenbuchsee Betriebs AG, in Herzogenbuchsee, CHE-389.823.418, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 23 vom 02.02.2022, Publ. 1005395103).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jakob, Hans Peter, von Rapperswil (BE), in Herzogenbuchsee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005395103, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
KREUZ Herzogenbuchsee Betriebs AG, in Herzogenbuchsee, CHE-389.823.418, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 182 vom 18.09.2020, Publ. 1004981250).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weibel, Albert, von Emmen, in Herzogenbuchsee, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Herzig, Peter, von Wynau, in Herzogenbuchsee, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mumenthaler, Laura, von Trachselwald, in Oberburg, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burkhardt, Isabelle, von Thurnen, in Obersteckholz (Langenthal), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Trachsel, Isabelle, von Mühlethurnen, in Obersteckholz];
Schärer, Michael, von Thörigen, in Herzogenbuchsee, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.