Reports for Krankenstation Friesenberg (KSF)
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Krankenstation Friesenberg (KSF)
- Krankenstation Friesenberg (KSF) is active in the industry «Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Zürich.
- The organization was founded on 29.03.1983 and has 6 persons in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 15.07.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-108.062.554.
Management (6)
newest members of the committee
David Peter,
Georg Keller,
Jeannette Frei,
Markus Hungerbühler,
Dr. Josef Widler
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Karin Stalder,
Georg Keller,
Markus Hungerbühler,
Dr. Josef Widler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.03.1983
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.6.900.279-6
UID/VAT
CHE-108.062.554
Sector
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck des Vereins ist die Führung einer Pflegestation, in der in erster Linie Bewohnerinnen und Bewohner aus dem Friesenbergquartier als Dauer- oder Kurzzeitpatienten Aufnahme finden. Zusätzlich ergänzt der Verein bei Bedarf die Angebote der Spitex-Organisationen. Die KSF orientiert sich dabei grundsätzlich an den Richtlinien der städtischen und kantonalen Gesundheitspolitik.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Meng und Partner Revisions AG | Baden | 10.11.2010 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FÖHRENSTRASSE SCHWEIZ AG | Adliswil | 21.11.2008 | 09.11.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Krankenstation Friesenberg KSF
- Krankenstation Friesenberg
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Krankenstation Friesenberg (KSF)
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006083851, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Krankenstation Friesenberg (KSF), in Zürich, CHE-108.062.554, Verein (SHAB Nr. 165 vom 28.08.2023, Publ. 1005824468).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baumgartner, Birgit, von Oberriet (SG), in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005824468, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Krankenstation Friesenberg (KSF), in Zürich, CHE-108.062.554, Verein (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 02.06.2022, Publ. 1005486510).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bobic, Nada, von Zürich, in Zürich, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baumgartner, Birgit, von Oberriet (SG), in Zürich, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes, Aktuarin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Stalder, Karin, von Winterthur, in Zürich, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005486510, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Krankenstation Friesenberg (KSF), in Zürich, CHE-108.062.554, Verein (SHAB Nr. 190 vom 30.09.2020, Publ. 1004988773).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Peter, David, von Zürich, in Uitikon, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.