Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Kraftwerk Wassen AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.01.1945
Deletion from the commercial register
14.05.2021
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wassen
Commercial Registry Office
UR
Commercial register number
CH-120.3.000.612-3
UID/VAT
CHE-105.966.695
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Bau und Betrieb von Kraftwerken im Reussgebiet. Die Gesellschaft kann auch andere Kraftwerke sowie Kraftübertragungs- und Verteilanlagen errichten, betreiben, erwerben und pachten. Sie ist befugt, sich an Unternehmen mit ähnlichem Zweck zu beteiligen und alle Geschäfte zu tätigen, die der Erreichung oder Förderung des Gesellschaftszwecks dienen können. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 27.08.2020 | 13.05.2021 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 03.10.2016 | 26.08.2020 | |
KPMG AG | Luzern | <2004 | 02.10.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kraftwerk Wassen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005180673, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Kraftwerk Wassen AG, in Wassen, CHE-105.966.695, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 26.01.2021, Publ. 1005083273). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die Schweizerische Bundesbahnen SBB, in Bern (CHE- 102.909.703), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005083273, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Kraftwerk Wassen AG, in Wassen, CHE-105.966.695, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 27.08.2020, Publ. 1004965862).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Camenzind, Urban, von Gersau, in Bürglen (UR), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schuler, Kurt, von Unterschächen, in Altdorf UR, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004965862, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Kraftwerk Wassen AG, in Wassen, CHE-105.966.695, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 13.01.2020, Publ. 1004802411).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bär, Barbara, von Schattdorf, in Altdorf UR, Vizepräsidentin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Radon, Georg, von Obersiggenthal, in Oberrohrdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-441.858.784), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Camenzind, Urban, von Gersau, in Bürglen (UR), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Evans, Richard John, amerikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Walchwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Deloitte AG (CHE-101.377.666), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.