Reports for Kopitas SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kopitas SA
- Kopitas SA has its legal headquarters in Cully, is active and operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Kopitas SA, which was founded on the 08.09.1910, consists of 3 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 09.02.2021.
- The company Kopitas SA is registered under the UID CHE-101.885.715.
Management (3)
newest board members
Sandy Kopitopoulos,
Derko Kopitopoulos,
Sarantis Kopitopoulos
newest authorized signatories
Sandy Kopitopoulos,
Derko Kopitopoulos,
Sarantis Kopitopoulos
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.09.1910
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bourg-en-Lavaux
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.134.700-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.885.715
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes opérations immobilières, soit l'achat, l'exploitation et la vente de tous immeubles, bâtis ou non, la construction de bâtiments ainsi que la gérance de tous immeubles; toutes autres opérations commerciales, financières, mobilières et immobilières en rapport avec son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Intermandat S.A., Société Fiduciaire | Lausanne | <2004 | 10.10.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- S.I. Kopitas SA
- S.I. Kopitas
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kopitas SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005096176, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Kopitas SA, à Villars-Sainte-Croix, CHE-101.885.715 (FOSC du 26.04.2019, p. 0/1004618266). Statuts modifiés le 01.02.2021. Siège transféré à Bourg-en-Lavaux.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de Lausanne 35, 1096 Cully.
Publication number: HR02-1004618266, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Kopitas SA, à Villars-Sainte-Croix, CHE-101.885.715 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de Sullens 2B, 1029 Villars-Ste-Croix. L'administrateur Kopitopoulos Sarantis signe désormais collectivement à deux.
Publication number: 5848094, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
S.I. Kopitas SA, à Villars-Sainte-Croix, CH-550-0134700-2 (FOSC du 29.01.2010, p. 22/5468746). Statuts modifiés le 15 septembre 2010.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Kopitas SA.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par courrier ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du conseil d'administration du 15 septembre 2010, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. Intermandat S.A., Société Fiduciaire n'est plus organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.