Address
c/o Yolanda Trachsler
Schaffhauserstrasse 22
8253 Diessenhofen
Reports for Kopf & Zahl GmbH in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kopf & Zahl GmbH in Liquidation
- Kopf & Zahl GmbH in Liquidation has its legal headquarters in Diessenhofen, is in liquidation and operates in the sector «Secretarial and office administration services».
- The management of the company Kopf & Zahl GmbH in Liquidation, which was founded on the 28.02.2006, consists of 2 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 21.05.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-112.791.573.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.02.2006
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Diessenhofen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.4.018.928-3
UID/VAT
CHE-112.791.573
Sector
Secretarial and office administration services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gegenstand der Gesellschaft ist die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Administrationsaufwendungen, Sekretariatsarbeiten, Finanzbuchhaltung, kaufmännischen Arbeiten für KMUs und Private. Des Weiteren bietet die Gesellschaft Beraterdienstleistungen in diversen Bereichen im In- und Ausland an und handelt mit selbst hergestellten Produkten. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Kopf & Zahl GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kopf & Zahl GmbH in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: LS02-0000065739, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Publikationsdatum: SHAB 21.05.2024 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 21.05.2029 Meldungsnummer: Liquidationsschuldenruf Kopf & Zahl GmbH in Liquidation Organisation in Auflösung: Kopf & Zahl GmbH in Liquidation CHE-112.791.573 Schaffhauserstrasse 22
Frist: 30 Tage Kontaktstelle:
Kopf & Zahl GmbH in Liquidation, Schaffhauserstrasse 22, 8253 Diessenhofen
Publication number: HR02-1006034785, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Kopf & Zahl GmbH, in Diessenhofen, CHE-112.791.573, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 23.12.2020, Publ. 1005056641).
Firma neu:
Kopf & Zahl GmbH in Liquidation.
Weitere Adressen:
c/o Walche Revisionsgesellschaft AG, Zürcherstrasse 183, 8500 Frauenfeld. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 06.05.2024 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Yvonne, von Lützelflüh, in Ramsen, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Trachsler, Deborah, von Wildberg, in Hemishofen, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Rüegger, Markus, von Rothrist, in Frauenfeld, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.