Reports for Konsumgenossenschaft Inden
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Konsumgenossenschaft Inden
- Konsumgenossenschaft Inden has its legal headquarters in Inden, is active and operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 19.08.2020. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The organization Konsumgenossenschaft Inden is registered under the UID CHE-107.393.480.
Management (3)
newest members of the administration
Christine Schwarzenböck,
Marianne Simmler,
Marianne Müller-Fischer
newest authorized signatories
Christine Schwarzenböck,
Marianne Simmler,
Marianne Müller-Fischer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.03.1992
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Inden
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.5.001.316-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.393.480
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung der sozialen Wohlfahrt und Verbesserung der Lebenshaltung ihrer Mitglieder auf dem Weg genossenschaftlicher Selbsthilfe, insbesondere durch gemeinsame Deckung des Bedarfs ihrer Mitglieder an Lebensmitteln und Gebrauchsgegenständen aller Art in guter Beschaffenheit und Abgabe derselben zu günstigem Preis unter Befolgung des Grundsatzes der Barzahlung.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
APROA AG | Visp | 10.10.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Konsumgenossenschaft Inden
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004961018, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Konsumgenossenschaft Inden, in Inden, CHE-107.393.480, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 19.03.2015, S.0, Publ. 2052391).
Domizil neu:
Brunnjistrasse 1, 3953 Inden.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zenhäusern, Antonius, genannt Anton, von Bürchen, in Inden, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schwarzenböck, Christine, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Inden, Mitglied und Sekretärin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Publication number: 2052391, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Konsumgenossenschaft Inden, in Inden, CHE-107.393.480, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 175 vom 11.09.2014, Publ. 1710097).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Toffol, Reinhard, von Naters, in Inden, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Sekretär;
Schnyder, Bernhard, von Bratsch, in Inden, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meichtry, Hans-Rudolf, von Guttet-Feschel, in Guttet-Feschel, Verwalter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit der Präsidentin.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Simmler, Marianne, von Wetzikon ZH, in Bubikon, Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Zenhäusern, Antonius, genannt Anton, von Bürchen, in Inden, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Müller-Fischer, Marianne, von Stetten AG, in Inden, Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Zuzwil SG, Präsidentin mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Sekretär oder dem Verwalter].
Publication number: 1710097, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Konsumgenossenschaft Inden, in Inden, CHE-107.393.480, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 196 vom 10.10.2011, Publ. 6369768).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
APROA AG (CHE-105.896.391), in Visp, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Beratung, Planung und Treuhand AG (CH-600.3.000.080-6)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.