Reports for Konsumgenossenschaft Betten
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Konsumgenossenschaft Betten
- Konsumgenossenschaft Betten in Betten is a Cooperative from the sector «Trading with various goods». Konsumgenossenschaft Betten is active.
- The management consists of 6 persons. The organization was founded on 24.03.1994.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 05.10.2021.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-107.593.470.
Management (6)
newest members of the administration
Heidi Dorothea Blum Zurbriggen,
Damian Franzen,
Silvia Imwinkelried,
Anita Eyholzer,
Margrit Mattig
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.03.1994
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Bettmeralp
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.5.001.598-8
UID/VAT
CHE-107.593.470
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Den Genossenschaftern Lebensmittel, Haushaltsartikel und weitere Waren zu möglichst vorteilhaften Preisen und in guter Qualität anzubieten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
APROA AG | Fiesch | 23.03.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schwestermann & Michel Treuhand AG | Fiesch | 01.02.2012 | 22.03.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Konsumgenossenschaft Betten
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005305527, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Konsumgenossenschaft Betten, in Bettmeralp, CHE-107.593.470, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 147 vom 02.08.2021, Publ. 1005262970).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Imhasly, Cornelia, von Bettmeralp, in Betten (Bettmeralp), Mitglied, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Blum Zurbriggen, Heidi Dorothea, von Bettmeralp, in Betten (Bettmeralp), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005262970, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Konsumgenossenschaft Betten, in Bettmeralp, CHE-107.593.470, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 23.03.2018, Publ. 4131817).
Domizil neu:
Dorfstrasse 60, 3991 Betten.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eyholzer, Iwan, von Bettmeralp, in Betten (Bettmeralp), Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imwinkelried, Silvia, von Bettmeralp, in Bettmeralp, Präsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Fiesch];
Franzen, Damian, von Bettmeralp, in Bettmeralp, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4131817, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Konsumgenossenschaft Betten, in Betten, CHE-107.593.470, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 16.12.2013, Publ. 1238345).
Sitz neu:
Bettmeralp.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mattig, Patrick, von Betten, in Bettmeralp, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Imhof, Natalie, von Betten, in Betten (Bettmeralp), Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schwestermann & Michel Treuhand AG (CH-600.3.001.681-7), in Fiesch, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imwinkelried, Silvia, von Fiesch, in Bettmeralp, Präsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eyholzer, Iwan, von Bettmeralp, in Betten (Bettmeralp), Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Betten];
Imhasly, Cornelia, von Bettmeralp, in Betten (Bettmeralp), Mitglied, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Minnig, Cornelia, von Betten];
Eyholzer, Anita, von Bettmeralp, in Betten (Bettmeralp), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Franzen, Anita, von Betten];
Mattig, Margrit, von Bettmeralp, in Betten (Bettmeralp), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: von Betten];
Margelisch, Ruth, von Buus, in Mörel (Mörel-Filet), Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
APROA AG (CHE-237.804.330), in Fiesch, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.