Reports for Kokou Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kokou Sàrl
- Kokou Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Vevey and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of general healthcare facilities».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 16.07.1996.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 03.07.2009. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Kokou Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-106.870.388.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.07.1996
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Vevey
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.078.687-1
UID/VAT
CHE-106.870.388
Sector
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
exploitation d'un cabinet d'ostéopathie et de manière générale tout ce qui touche à la médecine.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Gottraux M. & Cie Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kokou Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5113042, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Kokou S.à r.l., à Vevey, CH-550-0078687-1, exploitation d'un cabinet d'ostéopathie (FOSC du 07.08.2000, p. 5366). Statuts modifiés le 16 juin 2009.
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts. Selon déclaration de la gérante du 16 juin 2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. Le capital social porté de CHF 20'000 est maintenant composé de 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. Chauvy Bertrand n'est plus associé;
il cède sa part de CHF 1'000 à l'associée-gérante Mamin Catherine désornmais titulaire de 20 parts de CHF 1'000.
Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Kokou S. à r. l., à V e v e y , exploitation d'un cabinet d'osthéopathie (FOSC du 17.02.1999, p. 1101). Le capital de CHF 20 000 est actuellement entièrement libéré.
Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
M. Gottraux & Cie S. à r. l., à V e v e y (FOSC du 31.7.1996, p. 4605). Statuts modifiés le 29 janvier 1999.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Kokou S. à r. l. Myriam Gottraux n'est plus associée-gérante, sa signature est radiée, sa part de fr. 19 000 est cédée à la nouvelle associée- gérante avec signature individuelle: Catherine Mamin, de Blonay, à La Tour- de-Peilz. Pierre Von Kaenel n'est plus associé, sa part de fr. 1000 est cédée au nouvel associé: Bertrand Chauvy, de Yens-sur-Morges, à Morges. ORFA - Organe de Révision des Fiduciaires Associées S .A. n'est plus réviseur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.